Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1720142

EP1720142 - Vehicle security monitor system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2008
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 20.08.2008  [2008/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 5052
Troy, MI 48007 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/45]For all designated states
Delphi Technologies, Inc.
P.O. Box 5052
Troy, Michigan 48007 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Widmann, Glenn R.
16589 Brookhollow Drive
Noblesville, IN 46062-7150 / US
02 / Scharenbroch, Gregory K.
1726 Tall Oaks Drive
Kokomo, IN 46901 / US
03 / Harter Jr., Joseph E.
4208 Michael Drive
Kokomo, IN 46902 / US
04 / Smith, Matthew R.
14195 Autumn Woods Dr.
Westfield, IN 46074 / US
 [2006/45]
Representative(s)Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi France SAS
Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2
22, avenue des Nations
CS 65059 Villepinte
95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi European Headquarters 64 avenue de la Pleine de France Paris Nord II B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Former [2006/45]Denton, Michael John , et al
Delphi European Headquarters, 64 avenue de la Plaine de France, Paris Nord II, B.P. 65059, Tremblay en France
95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date06075888.514.04.2006
[2006/45]
Priority number, dateUS2005012342906.05.2005         Original published format: US 123429
[2006/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1720142
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:G08B13/196
[2006/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/45]
TitleGerman:System und Verfahren zur Fahrzeugsicherheitsüberwachung[2006/45]
English:Vehicle security monitor system and method[2006/45]
French:Système de surveillance de la sécurité du véhicule et procédé[2006/45]
Examination procedure08.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/26]
18.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.12.2007Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/25]
05.02.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2008/25]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO02093521  (WADE, DARREN, GEORGE) [X] 1,5-13,17-21 * page 3, line 11 - page 6, line 11; figures 2,7 * [Y] 2-4,14-16;
 [X]DE20319131U  (HERTH+BUSS GMBH & CO. KG; KNUEPFER, JUERGEN) [X] 1,7,12 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO0197524  (SCAMAN, ROBERT, JEFF; HAMILTON, JEFFREY, A) [Y] 2-4,14-16 * claim 7 *;
 [A]CA2087755  (BLACKWELL, ERROL) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE19913841  (KLEIN, HANSJOERG; THOMA, FRIEDRICH) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *