Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1757257

EP1757257 - Adaptable absorbent articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2013
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
13.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
199 Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
[2016/23]
Former [2007/09]For all designated states
McNeil-PPC, Inc.
Grandview Road
Skillman, NJ 08558 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Fernandez-Kleinklein, Elena
Marbacher Strasse 83
40597 Dusseldorf / DE
02 / Mangin, Sophie
Pr. Beatrixlaan 523
2284 AT Rijswijk / NL
 [2007/09]
Representative(s)Kirsch, Susan Edith , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2014/12]
Former [2013/45]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2007/09]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date06076526.022.05.2002
[2007/09]
Priority number, dateUS2001086352923.05.2001         Original published format: US 863529
US2001096242525.09.2001         Original published format: US 962425
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1757257
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1757257
Date:02.05.2007
[2007/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1757257
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/474, A61F13/47
[2013/13]
Former International [2007/18]A61F13/15, A61F13/472, A61F13/474
Former International [2007/09]A61F13/15
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2007/09]
TitleGerman:Anpassungsfähige absorbierenden Artikel[2007/09]
English:Adaptable absorbent articles[2007/09]
French:Articles absorbants adapatables[2007/09]
Examination procedure26.10.2007Examination requested  [2007/50]
26.02.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2013Fee for grant paid
24.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02253583.5  / EP1260205
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020253583) is  06.10.2005
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  28.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/03]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  28.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2018/27]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Dehns
St. Brides House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  28.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Essity Hygiene and Health Aktiebolag
405 03 Göteborg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/03]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  28.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
Bäckstensgatan 5
405 03 Gothenburg / SE
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/46]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  28.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
Bäckstensgatan 5
405 03 Gothenburg / SE
Opponent's representative
Furlong, Christopher Heinrich
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/38]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  28.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 03  06.08.2014  12.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
SCA Hygiene Products AB
Bäckstensgatan 5
405 03 Gothenburg / SE
Opponent's representative
Furlong, Christopher Heinrich
Hoffmann - Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastraße 4
D-81925 München / DE
Former [2014/37]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014  30.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
 02  28.07.2014  07.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Opponent's representative
Anderson, James Edward George
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2014/31]
Opponent(s)01  25.06.2014   
Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc.
2300 Winchester Road
Neenah WI 54956 / US
Opponent's representative
Davies, Christopher Robert
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
16.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
24.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
09.06.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.07.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
07.07.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.09.2016Appeal received No.  T2120/16
11.11.2016Statement of grounds filed
29.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
04.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
04.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
10.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
TR06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE22.05.2014
LU22.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/31]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE22.05.2014
LU22.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2016/28]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
GR07.02.2014
PT06.03.2014
IE22.05.2014
LU22.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/21]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
PT06.03.2014
IE22.05.2014
LU22.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/09]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
PT06.03.2014
LU22.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/08]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
PT06.03.2014
LU22.05.2014
CH31.05.2014
LI31.05.2014
Former [2015/04]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
PT06.03.2014
LU22.05.2014
Former [2014/41]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/28]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/26]AT06.11.2013
BE06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
Former [2014/24]AT06.11.2013
ES06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
Former [2014/22]FI06.11.2013
NL06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[XY]DE29614542U  (KAPAI MONIKA [DE]) [X] 1-3,6 * page 1; figure - * [Y] 4,7;
 [X]WO9602217  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * page 8, lines 17-32; figures 1-6 *;
 [XY]DE19834785  (ANIC MONIKA [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * column 2, line 54 - column 4, line 24; figure - * [Y] 4,7;
 [XY]EP1008333  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3,6 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022]; figure - * [Y] 4,7;
 [XY]WO0013633  (SCA HYGIENE PROD AB [SE], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * page 8, line 28 - page 16, line 18; figures 6,7 * [Y] 4,7;
 [XY]US5704929  (BIEN DENISE JEAN [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 3, line 6 - column 6, line 67; figure - * [Y] 4,7;
 [Y]US5728085  (WIDLUND URBAN [SE], et al) [Y] 7 * column 10, lines 37-46 *;
 [Y]WO9515139  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [Y] 4 * page 8, paragraph 2 *
by applicantDE29614542U
 WO9602217
 DE19834785
 EP1008333
 WO0013633
 US5728085
 WO9515139