Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1731182

EP1731182 - Percutaneous access device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.08.2013
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU, LU
published on 19.08.2015  [2015/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CODMAN & SHURTLEFF INC.
325 Paramount Ave
Raynham, MA 02767-0350 / US
[2006/50]
Inventor(s)01 / Sommerich, Rob
5 Beach St.
Norton MA 02866 / US
 [2006/50]
Representative(s)Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London
WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/51]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2006/50]Mercer, Christopher Paul , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date06076669.828.05.2004
[2006/50]
Priority number, dateUS2003044917930.05.2003         Original published format: US 449179
[2006/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1731182
Date:13.12.2006
Language:EN
[2006/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1731182
Date:26.09.2012
Language:EN
[2012/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61M39/02
[2012/09]
Former International [2006/50]A61M1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/50]
TitleGerman:Perkutane Zugangsvorrichtung[2006/50]
English:Percutaneous access device[2006/50]
French:Dispositif d'accès percutane[2006/50]
Examination procedure29.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/28]
02.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.06.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.08.2012Fee for grant paid
16.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP04253209.3  / EP1481697
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040253209) is  08.07.2005
Opposition(s)27.06.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
14.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
12.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 07
11.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 08
29.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.05.2004
AT26.09.2012
BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
DK26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
MC26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
PT28.01.2013
IE28.05.2013
LU28.05.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT26.09.2012
BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
DK26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
MC26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
TR26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
PT28.01.2013
IE28.05.2013
Former [2014/20]AT26.09.2012
BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
DK26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
MC26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
PT28.01.2013
IE28.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT26.09.2012
BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
DK26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
MC26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/34]AT26.09.2012
BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
DK26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
BG26.12.2012
GR27.12.2012
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/31]AT26.09.2012
BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
GR27.12.2012
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/28]BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
GR27.12.2012
PT28.01.2013
Former [2013/23]BE26.09.2012
CY26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
PL26.09.2012
RO26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
SK26.09.2012
GR27.12.2012
Former [2013/22]BE26.09.2012
CZ26.09.2012
EE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
NL26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
GR27.12.2012
Former [2013/20]BE26.09.2012
FI26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
GR27.12.2012
Former [2013/11]FI26.09.2012
SI26.09.2012
GR27.12.2012
Former [2013/09]FI26.09.2012
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5728103  (PICHA GEORGE J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,8,11-13,15 * column 2, lines 28-53; figures 1A,4 * * column 4, lines 22-45 * * column 4, line 35 * [Y] 9,12,14,17-19,23-25,27,28;
 [Y]US4676782  (YAMAMOTO RONALD K [US], et al) [Y] 14,17-19,23-25,27,28 * column 3, line 45 - column 4, line 22; figures 3B,6A,8 * * column 5, lines 42-46 * * column 6, lines 38-57 * * column 6, lines 56,57 *;
 [A]US4959054  (HEIMKE GUNTHER [US], et al) [A] 16 * column 4, line 26 *;
 [Y]DE20012624U  (STORZ KARL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 9 * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 16, paragraphs 1-3 * * figure 2 *;
 [Y]EP0134340  (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US]) [Y] 12 * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 1 *
by applicantUS4676782
 US5728103
 US5728102