EP1750443 - Coefficient seed data production device and method for the conversion of information signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kondo, Tetsujiro c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Tatehira, Yasushi c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Hiraizumi, Kei c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 04 /
Asakura, Nobuyuki c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 05 /
Morimura, Takuo c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 06 /
Niitsuma, Wataru c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 07 /
Ayata, Takahide c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [2011/50] |
Former [2007/06] | 01 /
Kondo, Tetsujiro c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
02 /
Tatehira, Yasushi c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
03 /
Hiraizumi, Kei c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
04 /
Asakura, Nobuyuki c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
05 /
Morimura, Takuo c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
06 /
Niitsuma, Wataru c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | |||
07 /
Ayata, Takahide c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Representative(s) | Keston, Susan Elizabeth, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | Keston, Susan Elizabeth, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2007/06] | Keston, Susan Elizabeth, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06076714.2 | 14.11.2001 | [2007/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000348730 | 15.11.2000 Original published format: JP 2000348730 | JP20010110696 | 09.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001110696 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1750443 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1750443 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1750443 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/01, G06T3/40 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
G06T3/40 (EP,US);
H04N7/01 (KR);
G06T3/4007 (EP,US);
H04N7/012 (EP,US);
H04N7/0125 (EP,US);
H04N7/0137 (EP,US);
H04N7/0145 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/06] | H04N7/01 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/06] | Title | German: | Koeffizientengenerierungsvorrichtung und -verfahren zur Umwandlung von Informationssignalen | [2007/06] | English: | Coefficient seed data production device and method for the conversion of information signals | [2007/06] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de génération de données de type coefficient pour la conversion de signaux d'information | [2007/06] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 05.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.10.2011 | 06.10.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 24.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01982777.3 / EP1335596 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010982777) is 09.05.2006 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0975156 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0061]; figure 13 * [A] 4-12; | [A]EP1001353 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0064]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0084] ** paragraph [0102] *; | [EL]EP1267322 (SONY CORP [JP]) [EL] 1-12 * If the oldest priority (15.11.2000) of the application is validly claimed, this document is not usable. Otherwise this doc throw doubts on the second priority claim and may be used as a "E" doc.; paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0182]; figures 7,9 * | by applicant | EP0975156 |