Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1803860 RSS: dossier

Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 138
23.01.2009 Closing of application Search / examination 2
10.10.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
23.04.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
02.04.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.04.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.04.2008 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
02.04.2008 Refund order 20 % of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
28.03.2008 Request for further processing allowed Search / examination 1
26.02.2008 Request for further processing Search / examination 1
19.02.2008 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 1
16.07.2007 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.06.2007 Refund order search fee Search / examination 1
13.06.2007 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.06.2007 European search opinion Search / examination 2
13.06.2007 European search report Search / examination 2
06.06.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
06.04.2007 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
06.04.2007 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
06.04.2007 Priority document Search / examination 31
06.04.2007 Translation of priority document Search / examination 23
07.02.2007 Refund order 20 % of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
25.01.2007 Abstract Search / examination 1
25.01.2007 Claims Search / examination 5
25.01.2007 Description Search / examination 15
25.01.2007 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
28.12.2006 Drawings Search / examination 8
28.12.2006 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 3
28.12.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 6
28.12.2006 Specification filed by fax and/or in non-official language Search / examination 22