Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1810714

Designated contracting states(deleted) 
Examination procedure17.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2008/35]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200803   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.07.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:25.07.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:02.04.2008 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
 
Event date:15.05.2008 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE 8566
Code Expl.:-DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID
 
Event date:27.08.2008 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20080126