Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1810714

EP1810714 - Use of a combination of heroin and naloxon for drug substitution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.07.2008
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hermann, Holger Lars
Wollerauer Strasse 46
8834 Schindellegi / CH
[2007/30]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2007/30]
Representative(s)Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG
Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2007/30]Hepp, Dieter , et al
Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5
9500 Wil / CH
Application number, filing date06100581.519.01.2006
[2007/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1810714
Date:25.07.2007
Language:DE
[2007/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.03.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61P25/36, A61K31/485, A61K47/38
[2007/30]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2008/14]
Former [2007/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verwendung einer Kombination von Heroin und Naloxon zur Drogensubstitution[2007/30]
English:Use of a combination of heroin and naloxon for drug substitution[2007/30]
French:Utilisation d'une association d'héroine et de naloxone pour la substitution de drogues[2007/30]
Examination procedure26.01.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/35]
17.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2008/35]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.200803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US5298622  (PORTOGHESE ET AL) [X] 1-10 * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 10 *;
 [X]WO2004050020  (SIMON, DAVID, L) [X] 1-10 * page 36, lines 1-5; claim - * * page 29, line 4 * * page 10, lines 3-8 *;
 [X]WO0158447  (EURO-CELTIQUE, S.A; OSHLACK, BENJAMIN; CURTIS, WRIGHT) [X] 1-10 * page 9, line 24; claim - *;
 [X]WO03013479  (EURO-CELTIQUE S.A; BREDER, CHRISTOPHER; COLUCCI, ROBERT; OSHLACK, BENJ) [X] 1-10 * page 16, line 19; claim - *;
 [X]WO0061147  (SOUTHERN RESEARCH INSTITUTE) [X] 1-10 * claim - *;
 [X]WO9932119  (EURO-CELTIQUE, S.A; KAIKO, ROBERT, F; COLUCCI, ROBERT, D) [X] 1-10 * page 16, line 7; claim - * * page 15 *;
 [X]DE10237057  (GRUENENTHAL GMBH) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0004]; claim - *;
 [A]US2005043280  (GEISSLINGER GERD ET AL) [A] 1-10 * claim - *
 [X]  - COMER SANDRA DEAN, "Buprenorphine/naloxone combination tablets (Suboxone(R)) reduce intranasal heroin self-administration by humans.", FASEB JOURNAL, & FASEB MEETING ON EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY: TRANSLATING THE GENOME; SAN DIEGO, CA, USA; APRIL 11-15, 2003, (200303), vol. 17, no. 4-5, ISSN 0892-6638, pages Abstract No. 138.1 URL - http://ww, XP009063775 [X] 1-10 * abstract *
 [X]  - COMER SANDRA D ET AL, "Buprenorphine/naloxone reduces the reinforcing and subjective effects of heroin in heroin-dependent volunteers", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (200510), vol. 181, no. 4, ISSN 0033-3158, pages 664 - 675, XP009063773 [X] 1-10 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00213-005-0023-6
 [A]  - GREYDANUS D E ET AL, "The adolescent and substance abuse: Current concepts", CURRENT PROBLEMS IN PEDIATRIC AND ADOLESCENT HEALTH CARE, MOSBY, (200503), vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 1538-5442, pages 78 - 98, XP004757330 [A] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cppeds.2004.12.007
 [A]  - GONZALEZ G ET AL, "Treatment of heroin (diamorphine) addiction: Current approaches and future prospects", DRUGS 2002 NEW ZEALAND, (2002), vol. 62, no. 9, ISSN 0012-6667, pages 1331 - 1343, XP009063827 [A] 1-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00003495-200262090-00004