Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1694103

EP1694103 - Method for implanting an electronic component on a support in order to increase resistance of the assembly to repeated impacts and vibrations and system comprising said component and support [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.08.2008
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 13.10.2010  [2010/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAGNETI MARELLI FRANCE
45, rue des Hautes Pâtures
92000 Nanterre / FR
[2006/39]
Former [2006/34]For all designated states
Magneti Marelli France S.A.S
45, rue des Hautes Pâtures
92000 Nanterre / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Aujay, Olivier
3 boulevard Aristide Briand
86100 Chatellerault / FR
02 / Grohando, Claude
52, rue Joseph Mergau
86100 Chatellerault / FR
 [2006/34]
Representative(s)Texier, Christian
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2006/34]Texier, Christian
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date06110146.520.02.2006
[2006/34]
Priority number, dateFR2005000176522.02.2005         Original published format: FR 0501765
[2006/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1694103
Date:23.08.2006
Language:EN
[2006/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1694103
Date:30.08.2006
[2006/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1694103
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP01.08.2006
ClassificationInternational:H05K1/02, H05K1/18, H05K3/30
[2006/34]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/34]
TitleGerman:Verfahren für die Bestückung eines elektronischen Komponentes auf eine Auflage um den Widerstand des Aufbaus gegen widerholte Stösse und Erschütterungen zu erhöhen und System umfassend solch ein Komponent und Auflage[2007/03]
English:Method for implanting an electronic component on a support in order to increase resistance of the assembly to repeated impacts and vibrations and system comprising said component and support[2006/34]
French:Procédé d'implantation d'un composant électronique sur un support de sorte à augmenter la résistance de l'assemblage à des chocs et vibrations répétés et système comprenant lesdits composant et support[2006/34]
Former [2006/34]Verfahren für die Bestückung eines elektronischen Komponentes auf eine Auflage um den Widerstand des Aufbaus gegen widerholte Stösse und Erschütterungen zu erhöhen
Examination procedure24.10.2006Examination requested  [2006/49]
20.04.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.07.2007Fee for grant paid
30.07.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2008No opposition filed within time limit [2008/38]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
EE10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
SI10.10.2007
TR10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
IE20.02.2008
LU20.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
[2010/41]
Former [2010/33]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
EE10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
SI10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
IE20.02.2008
LU20.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2010/02]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
CY10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
EE10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
SI10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
IE20.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/29]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
EE10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
SI10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
IE20.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/11]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
EE10.10.2007
FI10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
GR11.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
IE20.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2009/08]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
IE20.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/46]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
MC28.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/40]AT10.10.2007
BE10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/35]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
DK10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/29]AT10.10.2007
CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/27]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
LV10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Former [2008/24]CH10.10.2007
LI10.10.2007
LT10.10.2007
NL10.10.2007
PL10.10.2007
BG10.01.2008
IS10.02.2008
PT10.03.2008
Documents cited:Search[A]US2004134680  (DAI XIANG [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figure 2 * * claims 1,5-7,11,12,14,18,19,21,23 * * the whole document *;
 [A]US5426568  (LAMERS JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7-11,13,15,16 * figure 5 * * abstract * * column 1, line 40 - line 43 * * column 3, line 25 - line 46 * * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0696880  (DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO [DE]) [A] 1-3,7,9-11,15 * figure 1 * * claim 1 * * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 11 * * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH03270030
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920228), vol. 016, no. 084, Database accession no. (E - 1172), [A] 1,9 * abstract *