Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1712610

EP1712610 - Detergent Compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.10.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2013/45]
Former [2006/42]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
02 / Patterson, Steven George
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
 [2013/45]
Former [2012/24]01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
12 Warkworth Woods Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne, Tyne and Wear NE3 5RA / GB
02 / Patterson, Steven George
32 Ingleborough Close Mayfield Washington
Washington, Tyne and Wear NE37 1RZ / GB
Former [2006/42]01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
12 Warkworth Woods Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne, Tyne and Wear NE3 5 / GB
02 / Patterson, Steven George
32 Ingleborough Close Mayfield Washington
Washington, Tyne and Wear NE37 1RZ / GB
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/41]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2013/45]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2008/41]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2006/42]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle Upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date06110285.122.02.2006
[2006/42]
Priority number, dateEP2005025099822.02.2005         Original published format: EP 05250998
[2006/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1712610
Date:18.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1712610
Date:06.11.2013
Language:EN
[2013/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/386, C11D3/12, C11D3/06
[2006/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/42]
TitleGerman:Waschmittelzusammensetzungen[2006/42]
English:Detergent Compositions[2006/42]
French:Compositions de lavage[2006/42]
Examination procedure23.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/18]
25.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.06.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.04.2012Observations by third parties
30.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.07.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.07.2013Fee for grant paid
16.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.09.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.11.2013  14.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  22.07.2014  25.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  06.08.2014  11.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/04]
Former [2018/06]
Opponent(s)01  06.11.2013  14.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  22.07.2014  25.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  06.08.2014  11.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2016/50]
Opponent(s)01  06.11.2013  14.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  22.07.2014  25.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  06.08.2014  11.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/40]
Opponent(s)01  06.11.2013  14.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL
Opponent's representative
Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  22.07.2014  25.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  06.08.2014  11.08.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/37]
Opponent(s)01  06.11.2013  14.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  22.07.2014  25.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
 03  06.08.2014   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/35]
Opponent(s)01  06.11.2013  14.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  22.07.2014   
Dalli-Werke GmbH & Co. KG
Zweifaller Strasse 120
52224 Stolberg / DE
Opponent's representative
f & e patent
Fleischer, Engels & Partner mbB, Patentanwälte
Braunsberger Feld 29
51429 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
Former [2013/51]
Opponent(s)01  06.11.2013  14.11.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER N.V. / UNILEVER PLC
Weena 455/Unilever House, Blackfriars
3013 AL Rotterdam/London EC4P 4BQ / NL
Opponent's representative
Kan, Jacob Hendrik
Unilever N.V. Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
15.09.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
25.03.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
08.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.04.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition06.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1259/17
21.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
02.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1259/17
21.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
24.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1259/17
18.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
29.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1259/17
10.08.2017Statement of grounds filed
22.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.06.2010Request for further processing filed
30.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.08.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
27.07.2011Request for further processing filed
27.07.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
22.08.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
14.05.2008Request for further processing filed
14.05.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
29.05.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG06.11.2013
CY06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IE22.02.2014
LU22.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
[2016/31]
Former [2016/25]BG06.11.2013
CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IE22.02.2014
LU22.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/14]CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SI06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IE22.02.2014
LU22.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2015/07]CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IE22.02.2014
LU22.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/44]CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
MC06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
LU22.02.2014
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/41]CZ06.11.2013
DK06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/37]CZ06.11.2013
EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
SK06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/36]EE06.11.2013
FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/28]FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
PT06.03.2014
Former [2014/25]FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
LV06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/23]FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
IS06.03.2014
Former [2014/22]FI06.11.2013
LT06.11.2013
SE06.11.2013
Former [2014/20]LT06.11.2013
Documents cited:Search[DY]US5869438  (SVENDSEN ALLAN [DK], et al) [DY] 1-10 * column 18, line 10 - column 21, line 55 *;
 [DY]WO0060063  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DY] 1-10 * page 2, line 17 - line 21 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 16; claims 1-21 *;
 [DA]WO9942566  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 6 * * page 10, line 12 - page 12, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0258068  (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-22 *;
 [A]EP0305216  (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-43 *
ExaminationGB2287948
 WO03097780
otherWO03097780
 GB2287948