Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1712611

EP1712611 - Detergent compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.09.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2014/43]
Former [2006/42]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
02 / Patterson, Steven George
Procter & Gamble Technical Cebtres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
 [2014/07]
Former [2013/23]01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
12 Warkworth Woods
Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE3 5RA / GB
02 / Patterson, Steven George
32 Ingleborough Close
Mayfield
Washington Tyne and Wear NE37 1RZ / GB
Former [2006/42]01 / Lant, Neil Joseph
12 Warkworth Woods Gosforth
Newcastle upon Tyne, Tyne and Wear NE3 5 / GB
02 / Patterson, Steven George
32 Ingleborough Close Mayfield Washington
Washington, Tyne and Wear NE37 1RZ / GB
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/43]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2014/05]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne
NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2009/50]Howard, Phillip Jan
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2008/21]Howard, Phillip Jan
Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2006/42]Peet, Jillian Wendy
Patent Department Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton
Newcastle Upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB
Application number, filing date06110296.822.02.2006
[2006/42]
Priority number, dateEP2005025099522.02.2005         Original published format: EP 05250995
[2006/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1712611
Date:18.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/42]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1712611
Date:22.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:C11D3/386, C11D3/12, C11D3/06
[2006/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/42]
TitleGerman:Waschmittelzusammensetzungen[2006/42]
English:Detergent compositions[2006/42]
French:Compositions de lavage[2006/42]
Examination procedure23.03.2007Examination requested  [2007/18]
14.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
16.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.2013Fee for grant paid
23.09.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
06.01.2014Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
07.04.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.08.2014Fee for grant paid
08.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.06.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  16.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/04]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  16.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Opponent's representative
Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2017/21]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 02  16.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2017/11]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
McHugh, Paul Edward
Unilever Patent Group Unilever Colworth Sharnbrook Bedford
MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  16.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2017/07]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Newbould, Frazer Anthony
Unilever PLC
Unilever Patent Group
Colworth House
Sharnbrook
Bedford, Bedfordshire MK44 1LQ / GB
 02  16.07.2015  31.08.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/35]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015   
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
 02  16.07.2015   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  10.07.2015   
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Brooijmans, Rob Josephina Wilhelmus
Unilever Patent Group
Olivier van Noortlaan 120
3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL
11.09.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.05.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.06.2017Date of oral proceedings
14.07.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
05.09.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition28.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2186/17
15.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
27.09.2017Appeal received No.  T2186/17
15.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
27.10.2017Appeal received No.  T2186/17
12.01.2018Statement of grounds filed
23.07.2020Date of oral proceedings
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
06.01.2014Request for further processing filed
06.01.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.03.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.06.2010Request for further processing filed
30.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.07.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
16.08.2011Request for further processing filed
16.08.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
02.09.2011Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
25.04.2008Request for further processing filed
25.04.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
25.06.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
07.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG22.10.2014
CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
IS22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2016/12]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SI22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
IS22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2016/07]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IE22.02.2015
IS22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/46]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
MC22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/44]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
LU22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/37]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
SK22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/36]CY22.10.2014
CZ22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/35]CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
EE22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/34]CY22.10.2014
DK22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/26]CY22.10.2014
FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/24]FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
LV22.10.2014
SE22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/23]FI22.10.2014
LT22.10.2014
IS22.02.2015
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/22]LT22.10.2014
PT23.02.2015
Former [2015/20]LT22.10.2014
Documents cited:Search[DY]US5869438  (SVENDSEN ALLAN [DK], et al) [DY] 1-10 * column 18, line 10 - column 21, line 55 *;
 [DY]WO0060063  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DY] 1-10 * page 2, line 17 - line 21 * * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 16; claims 1-21 *;
 [DA]WO9942566  (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [DA] 1-10 * page 12, line 30 - page 13, line 6 * * page 10, line 12 - page 12, line 12 *;
 [A]EP0258068  (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-22 *;
 [A]EP0305216  (NOVO INDUSTRI AS [DK]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-43 *