Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1705442

EP1705442 - A refrigerator shelf [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.05.2016
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gemtron Corporation
615 Highway 68, West
Sweetwater, Tennessee 37874 / US
[2006/39]
Inventor(s)01 / Bienick, Craig
1088 Lumina Drive
Jenison, MI 49428 / US
 [2006/39]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2006/39]Selting, Günther
Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date06111509.321.03.2006
[2006/39]
Priority number, dateUS2005008889525.03.2005         Original published format: US 88895
[2006/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1705442
Date:27.09.2006
Language:EN
[2006/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1705442
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.08.2013
ClassificationInternational:F25D25/02, A47B96/02
[2006/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/39]
TitleGerman:Kühlschrankeinlegeboden[2006/39]
English:A refrigerator shelf[2006/39]
French:Etagère de réfrigérateur[2006/39]
Examination procedure17.03.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/18]
24.04.2014Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01)
03.06.2014Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments
23.06.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.04.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.11.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination18.01.2017Appeal received No.  T1054/17
16.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.06.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
26.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
26.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
27.03.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.03.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
25.03.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US5228764  (CHERRY DAVID N [US] ET AL) [X] 1,3-6,11,13,17-25,27,28,31,32,37-42 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 1, line 26 - column 3, line 20 * [Y] 2,3,5-10,12-18,28-42 [I] 7-10,26;
 [XYI]US2004173549  (HERRON WARREN L [US] ET AL HERRON III WARREN L [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4,19-30 * abstract * * figures 3a,21 * * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * [Y] 2,3,5-10,12-18,31-42 [I] 11;
 [E]WO2006044641  (DONNELLY CORP [US]; CLARION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]; PICKEN ALAN D [US];) [E] 1-4,11-15,17,19-27 * abstract * * figures 1,11,13 * * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0055] *;
 [IY]EP0527658  (DONNELLY CORP [US] DONNELLY TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [I] 1,2,4,11,12,14,15,19-27,37-42 * abstract * * figures 2,12 * * column 6, line 44 - column 8, line 43 * [Y] 3,5-10,13,16-18,28-36;
 [YA]US5358773  (FUJII MINORU [JP] ET AL) [Y] 2,14-16 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - line 35; figures 1,7 * [A] 1;
 [YA]EP0856712  (PROGRESS S R L [IT]) [Y] 12 * abstract * * column 1, line 17 - line 2; figure 5 * [A] 1;
 [YA]US870439  (KADE CHARLES F [US]) [Y] 29,30 * abstract * * figure 1 * [A] 1,4;
 [A]US5069408  (BESSINGER WALTER L [US]) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *;
 [A]US6811045  (MASKER DAVID WAYNE [US] ET AL) [A] 1-42 * the whole document *