EP1716840 - Hair-dye composition containing a glycerol ester and the corresponding hair-dyeing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Legrand, Frédéric 3 avenue du Château du Loir 92400, Courbevoie / FR | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'Oréal Service DIPI 9 Rue Pierre Dreyfus 92110 Clichy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Fevrier, Murielle Françoise E. L'OREAL - D.I.P.I. 25-29 Quai Aulagnier 92600 Asnières / FR | Application number, filing date | 06111860.0 | 28.03.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | FR20050050839 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: FR 0550839 | [2006/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716840 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716840 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/33, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61Q5/06, A61Q5/10 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K8/33 (EP);
A61K8/342 (EP);
A61K8/375 (EP);
A61Q5/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Färbemittel enthaltend einen Glycerinester und das Färbeverfahren dafür | [2006/44] | English: | Hair-dye composition containing a glycerol ester and the corresponding hair-dyeing process | [2006/44] | French: | Composition colorante comprenant un ester de glycéryle et procédé de coloration de fibres kératiniques la mettant en oeuvre | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.11.2008 | 08.09.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.11.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 09.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.03.2009 | CY | 04.03.2009 | CZ | 04.03.2009 | DK | 04.03.2009 | EE | 04.03.2009 | FI | 04.03.2009 | IE | 04.03.2009 | IT | 04.03.2009 | LT | 04.03.2009 | LV | 04.03.2009 | NL | 04.03.2009 | PL | 04.03.2009 | RO | 04.03.2009 | SI | 04.03.2009 | SK | 04.03.2009 | TR | 04.03.2009 | LU | 28.03.2009 | BE | 31.03.2009 | MC | 31.03.2009 | BG | 04.06.2009 | SE | 04.06.2009 | GR | 05.06.2009 | ES | 15.06.2009 | IS | 04.07.2009 | PT | 18.08.2009 | HU | 05.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
HU | 05.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
LU | 28.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
IT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
GR | 05.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/13] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
DK | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
BG | 04.06.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 04.03.2009 | |
CZ | 04.03.2009 | ||
EE | 04.03.2009 | ||
FI | 04.03.2009 | ||
IE | 04.03.2009 | ||
LT | 04.03.2009 | ||
LV | 04.03.2009 | ||
NL | 04.03.2009 | ||
PL | 04.03.2009 | ||
RO | 04.03.2009 | ||
SI | 04.03.2009 | ||
SK | 04.03.2009 | ||
MC | 31.03.2009 | ||
SE | 04.06.2009 | ||
ES | 15.06.2009 | ||
IS | 04.07.2009 | ||
PT | 18.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4919923 (HOEFFKES HORST [DE], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 30; table 1 *; | [A]FR2795312 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-27 * page 2, line 28 - page 5, line 2 * * page 9, line 7 - page 9, line 26 * * page 21, line 25; example 1A *; | [A]WO0230370 (OREAL [FR], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 2, line 9 - page 3, line 27; claims 1-3 *; | [XY]EP1232739 (SCHWARZKOPF GMBH HANS [DE]) [X] 1-26 * page 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 8; example 12 * * page 3, paragraph 20 - page 4, paragraph 24 * * page 3, paragraph 11 - paragraph 17 * * page 26, paragraph 199 - page 27, paragraph 205 * [Y] 27; | [A]DE10132915 (WELLA AG [DE]) [A] 1-27 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 7; examples 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1518547 (OREAL [FR]) [Y] 27* page 6, paragraph 49; claim 14 * | by applicant | US2261002 | US2271378 | US2273780 | US2375853 | US2388614 | US2454547 | FR1400366 | US3206462 | FR1492597 | FR1583363 | US3589578 | FR2077143 | FR2080759 | FR2162025 | US3874870 | FR2252840 | FR2270846 | US3929990 | FR2280361 | US3966904 | US4001432 | US4005193 | FR2316271 | FR2320330 | US4025617 | US4025627 | US4025653 | US4026945 | US4027020 | US4031307 | FR2336434 | FR2368508 | FR2383660 | US4131576 | FR2393573 | FR2413907 | FR2470596 | FR2505348 | EP0080976 | FR2519863 | FR2542997 | EP0122324 | FR2598611 | EP0337354 | DE4127230 | FR2692572 | WO9501772 | WO9515144 | EP0714954 | FR2807650 | FR2822696 | FR2822698 | FR2822693 | FR2822694 | WO02078660 | FR2825702 | FR2825625 | WO02100834 | WO02100369 | FR2829926 | FR2844269 | - "COLOUR INDEX INTERNATIONAL", DISPERSE RED, vol. 17 |