Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1842512

EP1842512 - Feminine hygienic article with wavy pattern [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  18.07.2014
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Opposition rejectedpublished on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/41]For all designated states
THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Di Virgilio, Maurizio
/ Via Ovidio Nasone No 29
66100, Chieti / IT
02 / Ecker, Cornelia
/ Sauererlenstrasse 1a
65824, Schwalbach / DE
03 / Gagliardi, Ivano
/ Via Montanara, 29
65123, Pescara / IT
04 / Mason Jr, Peter Charles
/ 8699 South Cove Drive
Maineville, OH 45039 / US
05 / Partenza, Vincenzo
/ Via Salita Municipio Vecchio No. 4
65010, Elice (Pescara) / IT
06 / Veglio, Paolo A
/ Via Piomba No. 23
65129, Pescara / IT
 [2011/39]
Former [2007/41]01 / Di Virgilio, Maurizio
Via Ovidio Nasone No 29
66100, Chieti / IT
02 / Ecker, Cornelia
Sauererlenstrasse 1a
65824, Schwalbach / DE
03 / Gagliardi, Ivano
Via Montanara, 29
65123, Pescara / IT
04 / Mason Jr, Peter Charles
8699 South Cove Drive
Maineville, OH 45039 / US
05 / Partenza, Vincenzo
Via Salita Municipio Vecchio No. 4
65010, Elice (Pescara) / IT
06 / Veglio, Paolo A
Via Piomba No. 23
65129, Pescara / IT
Representative(s)Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/32]Kremer, Véronique Marie Joséphine , et al
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2008/36]L'Huillier, Florent Charles
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
Former [2007/41]L'Huillier, Florent Charles
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50
65779 Schwalbach / DE
Application number, filing date06112392.307.04.2006
[2007/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1842512
Date:10.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1842512
Date:28.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.2006
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/15
[2007/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/41]
TitleGerman:Hygiene Produkt für Frauen mit wellenförmiger Struktur[2007/41]
English:Feminine hygienic article with wavy pattern[2007/41]
French:Produit d'hygiene feminine avec des motifs ondulés[2007/41]
Examination procedure02.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
16.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.08.2011Fee for grant paid
10.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.05.2008
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  28.06.2012  04.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-City, Ehime / JP
Opponent's representative
Kopf, Korbinian Paul
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/32]
Opponent(s)01  28.06.2012  04.07.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Unicharm Corporation
182 Shimobun, Kinsei-cho
Shikokuchuo-City, Ehime / JP
Opponent's representative
Kopf, Korbinian Paul
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
02.08.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.02.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.03.2014Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2014/34]
25.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
04.04.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.04.2014Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
06.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
IE07.04.2012
LU07.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2013/29]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
DK28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
PL28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
BG28.12.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
IE07.04.2012
CH30.04.2012
LI30.04.2012
MC30.04.2012
Former [2012/23]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
EE28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
RO28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
SK28.09.2011
IS28.01.2012
PT30.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
IS28.01.2012
Former [2012/12]AT28.09.2011
CY28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
Former [2012/11]AT28.09.2011
FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
LV28.09.2011
SI28.09.2011
Former [2012/09]FI28.09.2011
LT28.09.2011
Former [2012/08]LT28.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[X]US6264784  (MENARD MICHAEL JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 9,10 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 45; figures 4,15 *;
 [X]US6171432  (BRISEBOIS HENRI [CA], et al) [X] 9,10 * column 2, line 11 - column 5, line 50; figures 10-14 *;
 [A]EP1179329  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0016]; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2004060242  (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 26; figures 2a,5 *;
 [A]EP1362568  (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0007] - [0012] - [0025]; figures 2a,3 *;
 [A]WO03024706  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 10 - line 30; figure 6 *
by applicantWO03053313
 WO0207662
 US6264784
 US6171432