EP1845602 - Monitoring system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Servatec GmbH & Co. KG Bergstrasse 30 A 57627 Hachenburg / DE | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brenner, Josef Bergstrasse 30 A 57627 Hachenburg / DE | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Selting, Günther Patentanwälte Von Kreisler, Selting, Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Selting, Günther Deichmannhaus am Dom, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 06112531.6 | 12.04.2006 | [2007/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845602 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02J13/00 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
G01D4/002 (EP,US);
H02J13/00022 (EP,US);
G01D2204/18 (EP);
Y02B70/30 (EP);
Y02E60/00 (EP);
Y04S20/242 (EP);
Y04S40/126 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, LI [2008/26] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Überwachungssystem | [2007/42] | English: | Monitoring system | [2007/42] | French: | Système de surveillance | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 10.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/10] | 18.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   15.10.2009 | 30.04.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4418333 (SCHWARZBACH RICHARD J [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * columns 4,8,9,11 * * columns 12,14-16 * * columns 18,19 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0772132 (INSTA ELEKTRO GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 2 * abstract ** figure 1 *; | [Y]US6380852 (HARTMAN MICHAEL G [US], et al) [Y] 2 * figures 1,11 * * abstract *; | [Y]WO2004093283 (ENEL DISTRIBUZIONE SPA [IT], et al) [Y] 1-7,1-7 * page 15 * * figures 2,5,6 *; | [Y]WO2005039016 (NORLEN LEIF [SE]) [Y] 1-7,2 * pages 2,5,6,10 * * pages 11-13,15 * * figures 9,10 * |