blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1720378

EP1720378 - Hearing aid remote control as a network component and corresponding use [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  10.08.2012
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.08.2012Opposition rejectedpublished on 12.09.2012  [2012/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH
Gebbertstrasse 125
91058 Erlangen / DE
[2006/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Arz, Winfried
Schnieglinger Strasse 185
90427 Nürnberg / DE
02 / Fischer, Thomas
Michael-Vogel-Strasse 41
91052 Erlangen / DE
03 / Lotter, Thomas
Schmausengartenstrasse 7
90409 Nürnberg / DE
04 / Rückerl, Gottfried
Dietrichstrasse 9
90461 Nürnberg / DE
 [2006/45]
Representative(s)Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/02]Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al
Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2006/45]Berg, Peter
Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date06113300.528.04.2006
[2006/45]
Priority number, dateDE2005102031502.05.2005         Original published format: DE102005020315
[2006/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1720378
Date:08.11.2006
Language:DE
[2006/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1720378
Date:02.01.2008
Language:DE
[2008/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2006
ClassificationIPC:H04R25/00
[2006/45]
CPC:
H04R25/558 (EP,US); H04R2225/55 (EP,US); H04R2420/07 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2006/45]
TitleGerman:Hörgerätefernbedienung als Netzwerkkomponente und entsprechende Verwendung[2006/45]
English:Hearing aid remote control as a network component and corresponding use[2006/45]
French:Télécommande d'une prothèse auditif formant part d'un réseau et utilisation du meme[2006/45]
Examination procedure06.11.2006Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.11.2006Examination requested  [2006/51]
23.07.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.11.2007Fee for grant paid
20.11.2007Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.10.2008  24.10.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Oticon A/S/Phonak AG/Widex A/S/GN Resound A/S
Kongebakken 9/Laubisrütistrasse 28/ Ny Vestergardsvey/Lautrupbjerg 7
2765 SMOERUM/8712 Stäfa/3500 Vaerlose/2750Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ Speiser
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Stralauer Platz 34
10243 Berlin / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2012/34]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.2008  24.10.2008  ADMISSIBLE
Oticon A/S/Phonak AG/Widex A/S/GN Resound A/S
Kongebakken 9/Laubisrütistrasse 28/ Ny Vestergardsvey/Lautrupbjerg 7
2765 SMOERUM/8712 Stäfa/3500 Vaerlose/2750Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner
Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2
10178 Berlin / DE
Former [2008/47]
Opponent(s)01  02.10.2008   
Oticon A/S/Phonak AG/Widex A/S/GN Resound A/S
Kongebakken 9/Laubisrütistrasse 28/ Ny Vestergardsvey/Lautrupbjerg 7
2765 SMOERUM/8712 Stäfa/3500 Vaerlose/2750Ballerup / DK
Opponent's representative
von Oppen, Joachim F.M.
Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Straße 2
10178 Berlin / DE
07.11.2008Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
04.12.2008Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.10.2009Date of oral proceedings
23.11.2009Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
23.11.2009Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
30.05.2012Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2012/37]
Appeal following opposition03.02.2010Appeal received No.  T0364/10
06.04.2010Statement of grounds filed
30.05.2012Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
30.05.2012Date of oral proceedings
14.06.2012Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
TR02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
GR03.04.2008
AT28.04.2008
LU28.04.2008
BE30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
HU03.07.2008
ES29.04.2009
IT28.04.2010
[2012/03]
Former [2011/13]CY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
TR02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
GR03.04.2008
AT28.04.2008
LU28.04.2008
BE30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
HU03.07.2008
IT28.04.2009
ES29.04.2009
Former [2011/03]CY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
TR02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
GR03.04.2008
AT28.04.2008
LU28.04.2008
BE30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
HU03.07.2008
ES29.04.2009
Former [2010/41]CY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
TR02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
AT28.04.2008
LU28.04.2008
BE30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
HU03.07.2008
ES29.04.2009
Former [2010/33]CY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
AT28.04.2008
LU28.04.2008
BE30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
ES29.04.2009
Former [2010/02]CY02.01.2008
CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
AT28.04.2008
BE30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2009/19]CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
BE30.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2009/12]CZ02.01.2008
EE02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/50]CZ02.01.2008
FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
RO02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
SK02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
MC30.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/48]FI02.01.2008
IE02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/46]FI02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
SE02.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/44]FI02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
LV02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/42]FI02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
PL02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
PT02.06.2008
Former [2008/39]FI02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
BG02.04.2008
IS02.05.2008
Former [2008/36]FI02.01.2008
LT02.01.2008
NL02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
IS02.05.2008
Former [2008/27]NL02.01.2008
SI02.01.2008
Former [2008/26]SI02.01.2008
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0772375  (LUX WELLENHOF GABRIELE [DE]) [Y] 8 * column 4, line 33 - column 5, line 39 *;
 [Y]WO2004049631  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [Y] 3-8,10-12 * page 7, line 10 - line 17 *;
 [A]WO2004110099  (GN RESOUND AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-12* the whole document *;
 [XDY]DE10345173  (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [XD] 1,2,9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0014] , [0035] , [0043] , [0044] * [Y] 3-8,10-12;
 [Y]US2005071879  (HALDAVNEKAR NIKHIL A [US], et al) [Y] 6-8,11,12 * paragraphs [0010] , [0030] , [0047] - [0057]; figures 3a-3d *
ExaminationEP1460769
    - NGO, C., "A service-oriented wireless home network", CONSUMER COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2004, IEEE, (20040105), XP010696967
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.