Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP1720378 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1720378



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 694
04.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
07.08.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
01.08.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
31.07.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.07.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
30.07.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.07.2012 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 18
14.06.2012 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 2
14.06.2012 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
22.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
14.05.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
03.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
01.05.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.04.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
26.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.04.2012 Cited document during appeal procedure Appeal 14
25.04.2012 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
24.04.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
20.04.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
03.04.2012 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
30.03.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.03.2012 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
15.03.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.03.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
14.03.2012 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
13.03.2012 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 4
13.03.2012 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 3
27.07.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
12.07.2010 Authorisation Appeal 4
12.07.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 6
28.06.2010 F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) Appeal 2
28.06.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.06.2010 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.05.2010 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
28.04.2010 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
19.04.2010 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
06.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
06.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
06.04.2010 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 27
06.04.2010 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
06.04.2010 Non-scannable object Appeal 1
06.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
06.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 28
06.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
06.04.2010 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
06.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
06.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 12
06.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 28
06.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 8
06.04.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Appeal 16
06.04.2010 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 13
01.03.2010 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 2
09.02.2010 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
03.02.2010 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
26.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
25.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.11.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
24.11.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
23.11.2009 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 2
23.11.2009 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 7
23.11.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
23.11.2009 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.10.2009 Authorisation Opposition 1
02.10.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
30.09.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
30.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
30.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
30.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 27
30.09.2009 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 104
30.09.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
30.09.2009 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 2
04.09.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
25.08.2009 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
15.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.07.2009 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.07.2009 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 5
13.07.2009 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
13.07.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.07.2009 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.06.2009 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
11.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2009 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
05.03.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
20.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
19.02.2009 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
15.12.2008 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
04.12.2008 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
07.11.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
07.11.2008 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
31.10.2008 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Opposition 1
02.10.2008 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
02.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 8
02.10.2008 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 12
02.10.2008 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.12.2007 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.12.2007 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.11.2007 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
19.10.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
19.10.2007 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
19.10.2007 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
19.10.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.07.2007 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
23.07.2007 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
23.07.2007 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
23.07.2007 Text intended for grant Search / examination 10
13.11.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
06.11.2006 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
06.11.2006 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
06.11.2006 Description Search / examination 5
11.10.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.07.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.07.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 3
17.07.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
05.05.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
05.05.2006 Priority document Search / examination 11
28.04.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Claims Search / examination 2
28.04.2006 Description Search / examination 6
28.04.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Drawings Search / examination 1
28.04.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2