blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1854392

EP1854392 - Method for washing glass articles in a household dishwashing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussels / BE
[N/P]
Former [2011/27]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussel / BE
Former [2011/11]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Raketstraat 40
1130 Brussels / BE
Former [2007/46]For all designated states
Electrolux Home Products Corporation N.V.
Belgicastraat 17
1930 Zaventem / BE
Inventor(s)01 / Brambilla, Enrico
Via Treviso 31
20127 Milano / IT
 [2007/46]
Representative(s)Samzelius, Roger Mikael
AB Electrolux
Group Intellectual Property
105 45 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/02]Samzelius, Roger Mikael
AB Electrolux Group Intellectual Property
105 45 Stockholm / SE
Former [2011/42]Röder, Richard
Electrolux Rothenburg GmbH Factory and Development
90327 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2010/14]Röder, Richard
AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Group Intellectual Property
90327 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2007/46]Giugni, Valter
PROPRIA S.r.l. P.O. Box 365 Via della Colonna, 35
33170 Pordenone / IT
Application number, filing date06113809.511.05.2006
[2007/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1854392
Date:14.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1854392
Date:19.10.2011
Language:EN
[2011/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2006
ClassificationIPC:A47L15/00, A47L15/42, A47L15/44, A47L15/46
[2007/46]
CPC:
A47L15/0065 (EP); A47L15/0049 (EP); A47L2401/12 (EP);
A47L2501/07 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/46]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Spülen von Glasartikeln in einer Haushalt-Geschirrspülmaschine[2011/44]
English:Method for washing glass articles in a household dishwashing machine[2007/46]
French:Procédé pour laver des articles en verre dans une lave-vaisselle domestique[2007/46]
Former [2007/46]Verfahren zum Spülen von Glassartikeln in einer Haushalt-Geschirrspülmaschine
Examination procedure09.04.2008Examination requested  [2008/21]
09.05.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.11.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2011Fee for grant paid
09.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP10012267.0  / EP2329756
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.05.2008
Opposition(s)20.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.05.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
20.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
22.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
24.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.05.2006
AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
TR19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE11.05.2012
LU11.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
TR19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE11.05.2012
LU11.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2014/21]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
TR19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE11.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/29]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
FI19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE11.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/22]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
ES30.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE11.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/20]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
IE11.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/07]AT19.10.2011
BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2013/03]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
MC31.05.2012
Former [2012/37]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
IT19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
PL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/36]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
RO19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
SK19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/35]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
DK19.10.2011
EE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
BG19.01.2012
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/34]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
CZ19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/28]BE19.10.2011
CY19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/24]BE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
LV19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
SE19.10.2011
SI19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/23]BE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
NL19.10.2011
GR20.01.2012
IS19.02.2012
PT20.02.2012
Former [2012/21]BE19.10.2011
LT19.10.2011
IS19.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT19.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]GB907057  (ZIP IND LTD) [A] 1-3* page 2, lines 10-53 *;
 [XY]DE1210150  (BRAUN AG) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 35 - column 6, line 20 * [Y] 3;
 [X]US3718149  (MAZZA L) [X] 1-3 * column 1, line 26 - column 2, line 5 *;
 [Y]EP0611159  (BRIGHTWELL DISPENSERS LTD [GB]) [Y] 3 * column 4, lines 8-55 *;
 [X]US6058946  (BELLATI RICCARDO PAOLO FEDERIC [IT], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 10 - column 6, line 67 *;
 [X]FR2800982  (AEG HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 2, line 10 - page 5, line 5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.