blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1715723 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1715723



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 365
08.11.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
08.11.2012 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
02.11.2012 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Opposition 2
23.10.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
23.10.2012 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
23.10.2012 French translation of claims Opposition 5
23.10.2012 German translation of the claims Opposition 7
23.10.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 2
30.08.2012 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 1
30.08.2012 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 2
30.08.2012 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
23.08.2012 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
22.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
15.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.05.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 7
10.05.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
10.05.2012 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.05.2012 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 8
10.05.2012 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.05.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
10.05.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
10.05.2012 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
19.03.2012 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 8
14.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.02.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
16.02.2012 Claims Opposition 7
16.02.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
16.02.2012 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 4
27.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
27.01.2012 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
19.01.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
19.01.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.01.2012 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
05.01.2012 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
21.12.2011 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
20.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 8
20.12.2011 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
20.12.2011 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
20.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
20.12.2011 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2011 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
15.12.2010 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
08.12.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 1
08.12.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 8
08.12.2010 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
11.08.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
11.08.2010 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
26.07.2010 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.07.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
15.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
15.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 22
15.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
15.07.2010 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 18
07.07.2010 Notice of opposition Opposition 7
07.07.2010 Payment of fees and costs Opposition 1
10.09.2009 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
25.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
25.08.2009 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
25.08.2009 German translation of the claims Search / examination 7
25.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
28.04.2009 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
28.04.2009 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
28.04.2009 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
28.04.2009 Text intended for grant Search / examination 38
11.01.2008 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 2
02.10.2007 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 1
07.09.2007 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
07.09.2007 Claims Search / examination 7
07.09.2007 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.09.2007 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 6
13.07.2007 Communication concerning non paid of designation fees Search / examination 1
25.06.2007 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
26.05.2007 Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states Search / examination 1
11.12.2006 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
08.11.2006 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
08.11.2006 European search opinion Search / examination 3
08.11.2006 European search report Search / examination 2
27.09.2006 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
30.08.2006 Request for accelerated publication Search / examination 2
30.05.2006 Request for accelerated publication Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Claims Search / examination 6
16.05.2006 Description Search / examination 28
16.05.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
16.05.2006 Drawings Search / examination 2
16.05.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3