blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1715723


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
02.11.2012 Patent maintained (B2 publication) published on  05.12.2012  [2012/49]
26.10.2012 New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid
30.08.2012 New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
21.08.2012 New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision
09.05.2012 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
08.05.2012 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
16.12.2011 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
10.06.2011 Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative published on  13.07.2011  [2011/28]
10.12.2010 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.08.2010 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
09.07.2010 Opposition filed published on  11.08.2010  [2010/32]
04.09.2009 (Expected) grant published on  07.10.2009  [2009/41]
29.08.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
29.08.2009 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
14.04.2009 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
08.04.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
11.04.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.01.2008 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
26.09.2007 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
08.09.2007 New entry: Reply to examination report
13.07.2007 Definitive list of designations published on  15.08.2007  [2007/33]
07.07.2007 New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit
22.06.2007 First examination report
19.06.2007 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.06.2007 Request for examination filed published on  11.07.2007  [2007/28]
03.11.2006 Publication of search report published on  06.12.2006  [2006/49]
22.09.2006 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.10.2006  [2006/43]