blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1715723
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1715723Global Dossier 05.12.2012B2
EP1715723 07.10.2009B1
EP1715723 06.12.2006A3
EP1715723 25.10.2006A2
Priority number Date
EP06114027 16.05.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE602006009575D 19.11.2009D1
Priority number Date
EP06114027 16.05.2006
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DK1715723T 18.03.2013T4
DK1715723T 14.12.2009T3
Priority number Date
EP06114027 16.05.2006