blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1715723

Designated contracting states CH 
 DE 
 DK 
 LI 
Examination procedure25.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.07.2007AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007BG   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007CZ   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007EE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007HU   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007IS   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007LT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007LV   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007PL   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007RO   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007SI   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007SK   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007TR   M01   Not yet paid
European patent granted07.10.2009
Opposition procedure23.10.2012Fee for printing new specification paid 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:25.10.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:06.12.2006 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:06.12.2006 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:11.07.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20070526
 
Event date:25.07.2007 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20070625
 
Event date:15.08.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATION FEES PAID
Designated State(s):CH DE DK LI
 
Event date:07.10.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):CH DE DK LI
 
Event date:15.10.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH EP
Code Expl.:+ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE
 
Event date:30.10.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH NV
Code Expl.: NEW AGENT
Representatives Name:TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG
 
Event date:19.11.2009 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:602006009575
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20091119
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:14.12.2009 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T3
Code Expl.:+EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:11.08.2010 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED
Opponent Name:SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK GMBH
Effective DATE:20100707
 
Event date:13.07.2011 
Event description:OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED)
Opponent Name:SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK GMBH
Effective DATE:20100707
 
Event date:05.12.2012 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B2
Designated State(s):CH DE DK LI
 
Event date:05.12.2012 
Event description:PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM
Effective DATE:20121205
 
Event date:14.12.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH AELC
Code Expl.: CONTINUATION IN CHANGED FORM
 
Event date:24.01.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R102 602006009575 DE
Code Expl.: EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL
Effective DATE:20121205
 
Event date:18.03.2013 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DK T4
Code Expl.: AMENDED EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DK
Payment DATE:20180525
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20180529
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:31.07.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:20180601
Year of Fee Payment:13
 
Event date:09.05.2019 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R084 602006009575 DE
Code Expl.: DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE