Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1715723

EP1715723 - Hearing system with network time [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  02.11.2012
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2012Patent maintained (B2 publication)published on 05.12.2012  [2012/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Phonak AG
Laubisrütistrasse 28
8712 Stäfa / CH
[2006/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Glatt, Raoul
Kieselgasse 2
8008 Zürich / CH
02 / Knaus, Micha
Tägernaustrasse 43
8645 Jona / CH
03 / Laich, Rolf
Lorenweg 40
8630 Rüti / CH
 [2006/43]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
[2012/49]
Former [2006/43]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
Application number, filing date06114027.316.05.2006
[2006/43]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1715723
Date:25.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1715723
Date:06.12.2006
[2006/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1715723
Date:07.10.2009
Language:EN
[2009/41]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP1715723
Date:05.12.2012
Language:EN
[2012/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00
[2006/43]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   DK,   LI [2007/33]
Former [2006/43]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Hörsystem mit Netzwerkzeit[2006/43]
English:Hearing system with network time[2006/43]
French:Système auditif avec temps de réseau[2006/43]
Examination procedure26.05.2007Examination requested  [2007/28]
07.06.2007Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
25.06.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.10.2007Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
28.04.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.08.2009Fee for grant paid
25.08.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.07.2010  21.07.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
 [2011/28]
Former [2010/32]
Opponent(s)01  07.07.2010   
Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH
Gebbertstrasse 125
91058 Erlangen / DE
11.08.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.12.2010Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
19.03.2012Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
19.03.2012Date of oral proceedings
10.05.2012Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.05.2012Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.08.2012Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
23.10.2012Fee for printing new specification paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
01.04.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
13.07.2007AT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007BE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007BG   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007CY   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007CZ   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007EE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007ES   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007FI   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007FR   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007GB   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007GR   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007HU   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007IE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007IS   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007IT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007LT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007LU   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007LV   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007MC   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007NL   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007PL   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007PT   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007RO   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007SE   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007SI   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007SK   M01   Not yet paid
13.07.2007TR   M01   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2004110099  (GN RESOUND AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-13,17-26 * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 10 * * page 4, line 29 - page 13, line 8 * [Y] 14-16,26;
 [XY]US2004190737  (KUHNEL VOLKER [CH], et al) [X] 1-13,15-25 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0048] * [Y] 14-16,26;
 [XY]WO0207479  (GN RESOUND AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-10,12,13,18-26 * page 1, line 1 - page 12, line 29 * * page 13, line 18 - page 19, line 8 * [Y] 14-16;
 [Y]EP1445982  (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0030] *
by applicantUS2002131613
 DE10048341
 EP1657958
OppositionWO2004110099
 US2004190737
 WO0207479
 EP1445982
 EP1750482
 EP1395007
 WO03091877
 WO2005024785