Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1863266

EP1863266 - Photograph positioning device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2008
Database last updated on 26.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.12.2008  [2008/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Tekom Technologies, Inc.
9Fl., No. 150, Jianyi Rd.
235 Junghe City, Taipei / TW
[2007/49]
Inventor(s)01 / TSAI, Tien-Chin
Tekom Technologies, Inc. 9Fl., No. 150, Jianyi Rd.
235, Junghe City, Taipei / TW
 [2007/49]
Representative(s)Beck, Michael Rudolf
Beck & Rössig
European Patent Attorneys
Cuvilliésstrasse 14
81679 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/49]Beck, Michael Rudolf
Beck & Rössig European Patent Attorneys Cuvilliésstrasse 14
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date06114922.502.06.2006
[2007/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1863266
Date:05.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.07.2006
ClassificationInternational:H04N1/32
[2007/49]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2008/33]
Former [2007/49]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Bildpositionierungsvorrichtung[2007/49]
English:Photograph positioning device[2007/49]
French:Dispositif d'image de positionnement[2007/49]
Examination procedure06.06.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/49]
15.07.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2008/49]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200803   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US6023241  (CLAPPER ET AL) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * column 3, line 61 - line 67 * * column 5, line 40 - line 67 *;
 [A]US6437797  (OTA YOSHINORI) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 35 - column 2, line 18 *;
 [A]US6133947  (MIKUNI ET AL) [A] 1-8 * abstract *