Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1852508

EP1852508 - Actinomycetes polynucleotides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.01.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.03.2015  [2015/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE KITASATO INSTITUTE
5-9-1, Shirokane Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
National Institute of Technology and Evaluation
2-49-10, Nishihara Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
[2007/45]
Inventor(s)01 / Omura, Satoshi
3-3-12, Okamoto, Setagaya-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Ikeda, Haruo
1-2-5-1103, Shintsukagoshi, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP
03 / Ishikawa, Jun
2-21-7, Kanumadai
Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa / JP
04 / Horikawa, Hiroshi, National Institute of
Technology and Evaluation, 2-49-10, Nishihara
Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP
05 / Shiba, Tadayoshi
5-5-22, Kyonancho
Musashino-shi, Tokyo / JP
06 / Sakaki, Yoshiyuki
2-51-42, Kamariya Minami, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa / JP
07 / Hattori, Masahira
1-36-5, Miyamachi
Fuchi-shi, Tokyo / JP
 [2007/45]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [2007/45]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date06115565.131.05.2002
[2007/45]
Priority number, dateJP2001020408930.05.2001         Original published format: JP 2001204089
JP2001027269702.08.2001         Original published format: JP 2001272697
[2007/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1852508
Date:07.11.2007
Language:EN
[2007/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1852508
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/31, C07K14/36, C12Q1/68, C07K16/12, C12N1/21, C12P19/62, G01N33/569, G01N33/68, C12N1/20, // C12R1/04
[2008/10]
Former International [2007/45]C12N15/31, C07K14/36, C12Q1/68, C07K16/12, C12N1/21, C12P19/62, G01N33/68, C12N1/20, // C12R1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2007/45]
TitleGerman:Polynukleotide aus Actinomyceten[2007/45]
English:Actinomycetes polynucleotides[2007/45]
French:Polynucléotides d'actinomycetes[2007/45]
Examination procedure18.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/40]
27.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/10]
28.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2015/10]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02011679.4  / EP1262562
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020011679) is  31.05.2005
Request for further processing for:08.08.2007Request for further processing filed
08.08.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.08.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
30.06.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
31.05.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
27.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 09
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 10
30.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 11
24.05.2013Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201413   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9941389  (PFIZER PROD INC [US], et al) [A] * page 22 * * example 7.1.2. *;
 [X]EP0997528  (PFIZER PROD INC [US]) [X] 34 * example 6.2 * * page 11 * * page 15 *;
 [X]WO0109155  (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [X] 34 * abstract * * page 34, line 22 *;
 [X]  "Streptomyces fradiae tylosin-biosynthetic regulatory gene cluster", DATABASE EMBL, EBI, Database accession no. AF145049, XP002275600 [X] 1-6,8-14,22,23,26,27 * DNA *
 [X]  "Gamma-butyrolactone receptor protein TylP from Streptomyces fradiae.", DATABASE UNIPROT, EBI, Database accession no. Q9XCC7, XP002275601 [X] 17-21,24,25,28-33,35,36 * Protein *
 [X]  OMURA, SATOSHI ET AL, "Structure prediction of secondary metabolites of S. avermitilis by genome analysis", DATABASE CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 139:346383 CA, XP002266244 [X] 34 * abstract *
    [] TENNEN YUKI KAGOBUTSU TORONKAI KOEN YOSHISHU , 43RD, 31-36, (2001),
 [PA]  OMURA S ET AL, "Genome sequence of an industrial microorganism Streptomyces avermitilis: deducing the ability of producing secondary metabolites", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE. WASHINGTON, US, (20011009), vol. 98, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12215 - 12220, XP002253941 [PA] * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.211433198
by applicantWO9941389
    MOL. GEN. GENET., (1996), vol. 252, pages 255 - 265,
    SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 277, pages 1453 - 62,
    NATURE, (1998), vol. 393, pages 537 - 544,
    NATURE, (1997), vol. 387, pages 5 - 105,
    SCIENCE, (1997), vol. 278, pages 680 - 686,
    PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 12833 - 38,
    SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, pages 1520 - 23,