Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1840521

EP1840521 - Methods and apparatus for associating mapping functionality and information in contact lists of mobile communication devices [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.12.2009  [2009/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, ON N2L 3W8 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]For all designated states
Research In Motion Limited
295 Phillip Street
Waterloo, Ontario N2L 3W8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / Dickie, Ronald Anthony
510 Heatherhill Place, Waterloo
Ontario N2T 1H7 / CA
02 / Wilson, Nicholas Bryson
245 Fouth Ave.
Ottawa, Ontario K1S2L9 / CA
03 / Boudreau, Jesse Joseph
24 Alder Crescent
Ottawa, Ontario K1B 4X6 / CA
 [2007/40]
Representative(s)Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/40]Hibbert, Juliet Jane Grace
Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date06116846.407.07.2006
[2007/40]
Priority number, dateUS20060787541P31.03.2006         Original published format: US 787541 P
US20060788458P31.03.2006         Original published format: US 788458 P
[2007/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1840521
Date:03.10.2007
Language:EN
[2007/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1840521
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.10.2006
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/36, G06Q10/00, H04Q7/38, H04M1/725
[2007/40]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/40]
Extension statesRS05.03.2008
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zum Assozieren von Kartierfunktionalität und Information in Kontaktlisten mobiler Kommunikationsvorrichtungen[2007/40]
English:Methods and apparatus for associating mapping functionality and information in contact lists of mobile communication devices[2007/40]
French:Procédés et dispositifs pour associer une fonctionnalité de cartographie et de l'information dans des listes de contacts de dispositifs mobiles de communication[2007/40]
Examination procedure10.07.2006Examination requested  [2007/40]
30.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/49]
16.07.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2005114021  (KRULL JAY D [US], et al) [X] 1-38 * columns 7,52-64 *;
 [X]WO2004076977  (TOMTOM BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,4,8,10-12,15,19,21 * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 10 *;
 [X]EP0908835  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figure 4 *