Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1748422

EP1748422 - Methods and systems for natural language understanding using human knowledge and collected data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.01.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 08.02.2017  [2017/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AT&T Corp.
32 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10013-2412 / US
[2007/05]
Inventor(s)01 / Bangalore, Srinivas
65 Old Glen Road
Morristown, NJ 07960 / US
02 / Gupta, Narendra K.
24 Wetherhill Way
Dayton, NJ 08810 / US
03 / Gilbert, Mazin
87 Briarwood Drive West
Warren, NJ 07059 / US
 [2007/05]
Representative(s)Asquith, Julian Peter
Marks & Clerk LLP
Fletcher House
Heatley Road The Oxford Science Park
Oxford OX4 4GE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/05]Asquith, Julian Peter
Marks & Clerk, 4220 Nash Court, Oxford Business Park South
Oxford OX4 2RU / GB
Application number, filing date06117047.812.07.2006
[2007/05]
Priority number, dateUS2005018882525.07.2005         Original published format: US 188825
[2007/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1748422
Date:31.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.11.2006
ClassificationInternational:G10L15/18
[2007/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/40]
Former [2007/05]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Systeme für natürliches Sprachverständnis unter Verwendung von menschlichem Wissen und gesammelten Daten[2007/05]
English:Methods and systems for natural language understanding using human knowledge and collected data[2007/05]
French:Procédés et systèmes de compréhension du langage naturel utilisant les connaissances humaines et les données recueillies[2007/05]
Examination procedure31.07.2007Examination requested  [2007/37]
10.09.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.03.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.09.2010Date of oral proceedings
04.10.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
08.10.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/06]
21.04.2016Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/06]
Appeal following examination08.12.2010Appeal received No.  T0610/11
18.02.2011Statement of grounds filed
21.04.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.09.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
06.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
08.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
07.06.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5839106  (BELLEGARDA JEROME R [US]) [Y] 13,17-20 * column A *;
 [XY]  - SCHAPIRE R E ET AL, "Boosting with prior knowledge for call classification", IEEE Transactions on Speech and Audio Processing IEEE USA, Stevenage, GB, (200503), vol. 13, no. 2, ISSN 1063-6676, pages 174 - 181, XP002405475 [X] 1-11,15,16 * the whole document * [Y] 12-14,17-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSA.2004.840937
 [Y]  - IGO DAGAN AND SHULY WINTNER, "Statistical and learning methods in natural language processing", UNIVERSITY COURSES, Haifa, Israel, (2004), URL: cs.haifa.ac.il/~shuly/teaching/04/statnlp/chunking.pdf, (20061102), XP002405476 [Y] 12,14 * pages 40-41 *
 [X]  - TUR G ET AL, "Combining active and semi-supervised learning for spoken language understanding", SPEECH COMMUNICATION, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (200502), vol. 45, no. 2, ISSN 0167-6393, pages 171 - 186, XP004745789 [X] 1,2,5-7,15,16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.specom.2004.08.002
 [PX]  - GUPTA N ET AL, "The AT&T spoken language understanding system", IEEE Transactions on Audio, Speech and Language Processing IEE USA, Stevenage, GB, (200601), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 1558-7916, pages 213 - 222, XP002405477 [PX] 1-20 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TSA.2005.854085
by applicantUS5839106
    - TRANSACTIONS ON SPEECH AND AUDIO PROCESSING IEEE USA, (200503), vol. 13, no. 2, pages 174 - 181
    - "Combining active and semi-supervised leaming for spoken language understanding", TUR G ET AL., Speech Communication, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (200502), vol. 45, pages 171 - 186