Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1748475

EP1748475 - Etching method and etching apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2008
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Receipt of observations in an appeal 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SPP Technologies Co., Ltd.
Keidanren Kaikan 15F, 1-3-2, Otemachi
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 1000-0004 / JP
[2013/35]
Former [2012/19]For all designated states
SPP Technologies Co., Ltd.
8-11 Harumi 1-Chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-6108 / JP
Former [2007/05]For all designated states
Sumitomo Precision Products Co., Ltd.
1-10 Fuso-cho Amagasaki -shi
Hyogo 660-0891 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Murakami, Shoichi
SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS CO. LTD 1-10, Fuso-cho
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP
02 / Yamamoto, Takashi
SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS CO. LTD 1-10, Fuso-cho
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP
03 / Hiramura, Tatsuo
SUMITOMO PRECISION PRODUCTS CO. LTD 1-10, Fuso-cho
Amagasaki-shi Hyogo 660-0891 / JP
 [2007/05]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/18]Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 44 01 51
80750 München / DE
Former [2007/05]Skuhra, Udo
Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
Application number, filing date06117783.825.07.2006
[2007/05]
Priority number, dateJP2005021707227.07.2005         Original published format: JP 2005217072
[2007/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1748475
Date:31.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/05]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1748475
Date:07.03.2007
[2007/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3065, H01L21/00
[2007/05]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2007/46]
Former [2007/05]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Ätzverfahren und -gerät[2007/05]
English:Etching method and etching apparatus[2007/05]
French:Procédé et appareil de gravure[2007/05]
Examination procedure10.08.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
06.11.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2016Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2016
21.01.2016Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
05.02.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination05.04.2016Appeal received No.  T1721/16
06.06.2016Statement of grounds filed
30.09.2019Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2019/40]
21.11.2019Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2019/47]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.11.2007
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
29.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
31.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
31.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
29.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
31.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
31.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
31.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
Documents cited:Search[XA]WO2004112120  (SUMITOMO PREC PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]; MURAKAMI SHOICHI [JP]; KASAI KAZUO) [X] 6-10 * abstract * [A] 1-3;
 [XA]JP2003092286  (SUMITOMO PRECISION PROD CO) [X] 6-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0047] * * figures 1,2 * [A] 1-3;
 [XA]WO0062328  (SURFACE TECH SYS LTD [GB]; BHARDWAJ JYOTI KIRON [GB]; LEA LESLIE MICHA) [X] 6-10 * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 1 * * claim 20 * * figures 1,7 * [A] 1-3;
 [A]US2005087756  (SHIRAISHI AKINORI [JP]) [A] 1-3,6-8 * page 4, paragraphs 45,46 *;
 [XA]WO2004086478  (SUMITOMO PREC PRODUCTS CO LTD [JP]; NOZAWA YOSHIYUKI [JP]; KASAI KAZUO) [X] 6-10 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * [A] 4,5;
 [XA]WO2004097909  (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]; IBM [US]; PANDA SIDDHARTHA [US]; MOSDEN AELAN) [X] 6-10 * page 6, paragraph 30 * * figure 2 * [A] 4,5;
 [A]JPH11195641  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 4,5,9,10 * abstract * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - SHOULIANG LAI; WESTERMAN R; JOHNSON D; NOLAN J, "Advanced pressure control in time division multiplexed (TDM) plasma etch processes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, (2004), vol. 5342, pages 94 - 102, XP002416485 [A] 4,5 * page 96, paragraph 5 - page 97, paragraph 2 * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.521910