blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1758396

EP1758396 - Video processing apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.04.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 31.05.2017  [2017/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2007/09]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si
442-742 Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Heo, Hye-hyun, 19-323, Dormitory of Samsung
Electronics Co., Ltd., Maetan 3-dong,Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2007/09]
Representative(s)Hewett, Jonathan Michael Richard, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/09]Walaski, Jan Filip, et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Application number, filing date06117919.826.07.2006
[2007/09]
Priority number, dateKR2005006850927.07.2005         Original published format: KR 20050068509
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1758396
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1758396
Date:26.11.2008
[2008/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.2008
ClassificationIPC:H04N7/01
[2007/09]
CPC:
H04N7/0125 (EP,US); H04N7/01 (KR); H04N5/21 (KR);
H04N7/012 (EP,US); H04N7/0137 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [2009/31]
Former [2007/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Videobearbeitungsgerät und Verfahren[2007/09]
English:Video processing apparatus and method[2007/09]
French:Appareil de traitement vidéo et méthode[2007/09]
Examination procedure29.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/24]
27.05.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
10.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
06.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/22]
24.01.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/22]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.06.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
23.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
20.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
18.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
21.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
19.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO0115442  (REARDEN STEEL INC [US]) [A] 5* page 7, paragraph 2 *;
 [Y]US6392706  (SUGIYAMA KENJI [JP]) [Y] 1-4,6-11 * column 4, line 6 - line 44 * * column 6, line 30 - column 7, line 13 * * figures 3,6 *;
 [Y]US2002060746  (YUGAMI MASAFUMI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-11 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046]; figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.