blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1752866

EP1752866 - Slidable input device and portable apparatus including the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.11.2017
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.12.2017  [2017/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2007/07]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-Dong, Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si
442-742 Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Park, Sang-hyun
103-1103 SK Apt., 104-1 Jongam-dong, Seongbuk-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Ok, Joon-ho
(2/5) 171-46, Hongeun 3-dong, Seodaemun-gu
Seoul / KR
03 / Rhee, Young-ho
2-906 Hanyang Apt., Apgujeong-dong, Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
04 / Cho, Soo-ho
2nd Floor 174-14 Poi-dong, Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2007/07]
Representative(s)Grootscholten, Johannes A.M.
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Grootscholten, Johannes A.M.
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
Former [2007/07]Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date06117999.027.07.2006
[2007/07]
Priority number, dateKR2005007441412.08.2005         Original published format: KR 20050074414
[2007/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1752866
Date:14.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1752866
Date:18.07.2012
Language:EN
[2012/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2012
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/033, G06F3/048, H01H25/00, H01H25/06
[2012/29]
CPC:
G06F3/04815 (EP,US); H04B1/38 (KR); G06F3/0481 (EP,US);
H04M1/72469 (EP,US); G06F2203/04802 (EP,US); H01H2221/014 (EP,US);
H01H25/006 (EP,US); H01H25/04 (EP,US); H01H25/06 (EP,US);
H04M1/233 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2007/07]G06F3/033
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verschiebbare Eingabevorrichtung und damit ausgestattetes tragbares Gerät[2007/07]
English:Slidable input device and portable apparatus including the same[2007/07]
French:Dispositif d'entrée pouvant coulisser et appareil portable comportant celui-ci[2007/07]
Examination procedure27.07.2006Examination requested  [2007/07]
18.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05)
21.06.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/49]
18.07.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
30.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
31.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
24.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
25.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201712   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAI]US2003094354  (BADARNEH ZIAD [NO]) [X] 9,10 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0275] * * figures 1-313 * [A] 4,8 [I] 1-3;
 [XAI]EP1051034  (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 4,6,7,9,11,12 * figures 1-34 * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0231] * [A] 1-3 [I] 5,8;
 [A]US2001006904  (CHA JAE-MIN [KR]) [A] 4,5 * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0036] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.