blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1749692

EP1749692 - Seat apparatus for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.2011
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 23.02.2011  [2011/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2007/06]For all designated states
AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome
Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8650 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Yukifumi AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA
Intel.Prop.Dept. 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome
Kariya-shi Aichi 448-8650 / JP
 [2007/06]
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2007/06]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date06118339.802.08.2006
[2007/06]
Priority number, dateJP2005022539703.08.2005         Original published format: JP 2005225397
[2007/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1749692
Date:07.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1749692
Date:03.03.2010
[2010/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.02.2010
ClassificationIPC:B60N2/22
[2007/06]
CPC:
B60N2/22 (EP,US); B60N2/682 (EP,US); B60N2002/684 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2010/45]
Former [2007/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fahrzeugsitz[2007/06]
English:Seat apparatus for vehicle[2007/06]
French:Siège de véhicule[2007/06]
Examination procedure03.09.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.09.2010Examination requested  [2010/41]
04.09.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
08.10.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.01.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
12.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0359406  (FORD MOTOR CO [GB], et al) [Y] 4-5 * figures 1-3 *;
 [A]DE10041655  (FAURECIA AUTOSITZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-8* the whole document *;
 [A]DE10110529  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [IY]FR2842476  (FAURECIA SIEGES AUTOMOBILE [FR]) [I] 1-3,6-8 * the whole document * [Y] 4-5
by applicantJP2004081390
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.