blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1790811

EP1790811 - Locking device for a pivoting and tiltable fitting [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Aug. Winkhaus GmbH & Co. KG
August-Winkhaus-Strasse 31
48291 Telgte / DE
[2007/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Schewe, Florian
Eckelkamp 8
48369, Saerbeck / DE
02 / Kaup, Ludger
Südstr. 72
48153, Münster / DE
 [2007/22]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2011/41]
Application number, filing date06118881.914.08.2006
[2007/22]
Priority number, dateDE2005100012522.09.2005         Original published format: DE102005000125
[2007/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1790811
Date:30.05.2007
Language:DE
[2007/22]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1790811
Date:09.12.2009
[2009/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1790811
Date:12.10.2011
Language:DE
[2011/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2009
ClassificationIPC:E05C17/04, E05C17/24, E05D15/52
[2009/50]
CPC:
E05C17/24 (EP); E05D15/5205 (EP); E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
Former IPC [2007/22]E05C17/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/22]
TitleGerman:Verriegelungsvorrichtung für einen Dreh-/Kipp-Beschlag[2007/22]
English:Locking device for a pivoting and tiltable fitting[2007/22]
French:Dispositif de verrouillage pour une ferrure pivotante et basculante[2007/22]
Examination procedure07.05.2010Examination requested  [2010/24]
26.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2011Fee for grant paid
13.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.01.2011
Opposition(s)13.07.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.08.2006
CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
TR12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2013/29]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
FI12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/37]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
IT12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/36]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
RO12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
SK12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/35]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
DK12.10.2011
EE12.10.2011
IE12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
BG12.01.2012
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/34]CY12.10.2011
CZ12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/28]CY12.10.2011
LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/24]LT12.10.2011
LV12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
SE12.10.2011
SI12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/23]LT12.10.2011
NL12.10.2011
GR13.01.2012
IS12.02.2012
PT13.02.2012
Former [2012/21]LT12.10.2011
IS12.02.2012
Former [2012/20]LT12.10.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3111579  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE3305497  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10013697  (SIEGENIA FRANK KG [DE]) [A] 1-6 * column 5, line 2 - column 7, line 65; figures 1-12 *;
 [DA]DE20200770U  (WINKHAUS FA AUGUST [DE]) [DA] 1* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.