blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1757973

EP1757973 - Optical scanning system and image forming apparatus using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.10.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.11.2016  [2016/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2007/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Ishibe, Yoshihiro
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / Kato, Takahisa
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / Yasuda, Susumu
/ 2-2-46-1110 Morino
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
 [2015/49]
Former [2007/09]01 / Ishibe, Yoshihiro
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / Kato, Takahisa
CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku
Tokyo Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / Yasuda, Susumu
2-2-46-1110 Morino
Machida-shi, Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2015/49]
Former [2007/09]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date06119246.421.08.2006
[2007/09]
Priority number, dateJP2005023977022.08.2005         Original published format: JP 2005239770
JP2006014515425.05.2006         Original published format: JP 2006145154
JP2006019815920.07.2006         Original published format: JP 2006198159
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1757973
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1757973
Date:02.12.2015
Language:EN
[2015/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.2006
ClassificationIPC:H04N1/028, G02B26/08, G02B26/10
[2015/26]
CPC:
G02B26/105 (EP,US); G02B26/0833 (EP,US); H04N1/02815 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2007/09]G02B26/10, G02B26/08, H04N1/113
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2015/49]
Former [2007/44]DE,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2007/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Optisches Abtastsystem und Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung damit[2007/09]
English:Optical scanning system and image forming apparatus using the same[2007/09]
French:Système de balayage optique et appareil de formation d'images l'utilisant[2007/09]
Examination procedure09.07.2007Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/41]
22.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.10.2015Fee for grant paid
13.10.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.10.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.12.2011
Opposition(s)05.09.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
02.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
01.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT02.12.2015
[2016/36]
Documents cited:Search[X]US6069727  (CHO SUNG-MIN [KR], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [A]US6104522  (HAYASHI YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [A]US6133935  (FUJIBAYASHI KAZUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [A]US6275318  (KAMIKUBO JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002044326  (KATO MANABU [JP]) [A] 1-21* abstract *;
 [A]US2002163704  (HAYASHI YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [A]WO2004049034  (ADVANCED NANO SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [X]US2004119811  (BUSH CRAIG P [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * abstract *;
 [X]EP1553752  (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] * * figures 1,3-7 *
by applicantUS6069727
 US2004119811
 EP1553752
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.