Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1760142

EP1760142 - Laundry Scent Customization [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
11.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2013/38]
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
The Procter and Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Convents Andre Christian
Drie Lindenstraat 14
1831, Diegem / BE
02 / Eshuis Johan
Clementinastraat 55
2018 Antwerpen / BE
03 / Degeyter Raf Gustaaf Alfons
Lepelstraat 25-2
3540 Donk / BE
04 / Burckett St. Laurent James Charles Theophile Roge
17 rue de Spa
1000 Brussels / BE
05 / McCarney Colin Christopher
Avenue Bonaparte 11
1180 Brussels / BE
06 / Piper Heidi
Timmermanslaan 2
3080 Tervuren / BE
07 / Etesse Patrick Jean-François
40 rue Northomb
1040 Brussels / BE
08 / Verburg Joost
Leopold de Waelstraat 5
2000 Antwerpen / BE
09 / Porter Philip John
5 Paradise Row
Cramlington, Northumberland NE23 6QF / GB
 [2013/38]
Former [2007/10]01 / Convents Andre Christian
Drie Lindenstraat 14
1831, Diegem / BE
02 / Eshuis Johan
Clementinastraat 55
2018 Antwerpen / BE
03 / Degeyter Raf Gustaaf Alfons
Lepelstraat 25-2
3540 Donk / BE
04 / Burckett St. Laurent James Charles Theophile Roge
17 rue de Spa
1000 Brussels / BE
05 / McCarney Colin Christopher
Avenue Bonaparte 11
1180 Brussels / BE
06 / Piper Heidi
Timmermanslaan 2
3080 Tervuren / BE
07 / Etesse Patrick Jean-François
40 rue Northomb
1040 Brussels / BE
08 / Verburg Joost
Leopold de Waelstraat 5
2000 Antwerpen / BE
09 / Porter Philip John
5 Paradise Row
Cramlington, Northumberland NE23 6QF / GB
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/38]Samuels, Lucy Alice
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Former [2014/36]Vercruysse, Nicolas
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA
Intellectual Property Department
Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2013/40]Pickford, James Lawrence , et al
Procter & Gamble
Technical Centres Limited
Whitley Road
Longbenton
Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB
Former [2013/38]Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2009/50]Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Former [2007/10]Kellenberger, Jakob
NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA IP Patent Department 100 Temselaan
1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE
Application number, filing date06119881.831.08.2006
[2007/10]
Priority number, dateEP2005007700902.09.2005         Original published format: EP 05077009
[2007/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1760142
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1760142
Date:18.09.2013
Language:EN
[2013/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.12.2006
ClassificationInternational:C11D11/00, C11D3/50, C11D3/386, C11D17/04
[2013/12]
Former International [2007/10]C11D3/50, C11D3/386, C11D17/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/10]
TitleGerman:Riechstoffanpassung für Wäsche[2007/10]
English:Laundry Scent Customization[2007/10]
French:Personnalisation du parfum des lessives[2007/10]
Examination procedure03.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/42]
17.12.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.06.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.06.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.2013Fee for grant paid
24.07.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.12.2007
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  17.06.2014   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2014/30]
30.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
06.02.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
09.11.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition09.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0083/17
17.03.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU31.08.2006
AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
TR18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
CH31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
DE03.03.2015
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU31.08.2006
AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
CH31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
DE03.03.2015
Former [2016/25]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
BG18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
CH31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
DE03.03.2015
Former [2015/37]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
CH31.08.2014
IE31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
DE03.03.2015
Former [2015/35]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
DE03.03.2015
Former [2015/20]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
CH31.08.2014
LI31.08.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/19]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
LU31.08.2014
Former [2015/18]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
MC18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/41]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
DK18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/38]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
IT18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/28]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
PT20.01.2014
Former [2014/24]AT18.09.2013
BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
PL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/23]BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
CZ18.09.2013
EE18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
SK18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
IS18.01.2014
Former [2014/22]BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
NL18.09.2013
RO18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/18]BE18.09.2013
CY18.09.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/12]CY17.07.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
LV18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
SI18.09.2013
GR19.12.2013
Former [2014/11]CY17.07.2013
FI18.09.2013
LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
Former [2014/10]CY17.07.2013
LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
Former [2014/09]LT18.09.2013
SE18.09.2013
Former [2014/08]LT18.09.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]US2003104969  (CASWELL DEBRA SUE [CN], et al) [X] 1-10,13,15,18-23,26-31 * paragraphs [0745] , [0761] , [0767] , [0773] , [0784]; examples XXXII,XXXIII; claims 43,45,50-68,75,76,78 *;
 [DX]WO2005042688  (SUNSHINEMAKERS INC [US], et al) [DX] 18-20,22,23,27-31 * page 3, line 9 - line 13; claims 1,12 *
by applicantUS4131555
 US4228026
 WO2005042688
 GB2304740
 IT1298898
 EP0391087
 US2003104989
 WO9533044
 WO9909126
 US5916862
 US5565145
 US5470507
 US5466802
 US5460752
 US5458810
 US5458809
 US2003104969
 US2005026793
 US5747443
 WO9850010
 US2004253199
 WO02066591
 US2005124512
 EP1533415
 US2004248762
 EP1167507
 US5378468
 US5626852
 US5710122
 US5716918
 US5721202
 US5744435
 US5756827
 US5830835
 US5919752
 WO0002986
 WO0104248
 US4186573
 WO0125526
 US4026131
 US4260054
 US4588080
 CA1133712
 US4379515
 US4882917
 WO0107703
 WO0100770
 US4884704
    - A. LEO, Comprehensive Medicinal Chemistry, PERGAMON PRESS, (1990), vol. 4, page 295
    - A. J. GORDON; R. A. FORD, The Chemist's Companion, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1972), pages 30 - 36
    - D. T. STANTON ET AL., "Computer-Assisted Prediction of Normal Boiling Points of Pyrans and Pyrroles", J. CHEM. INF. COMPUT. SCI., (1992), vol. 32, pages 306 - 316
    - D. T. STANTON ET AL., "Computer-Assisted Prediction of Normal Boiling Points of Furans, Tetrahydrofurans, and Thiophenes", J. CHEM. INF. COMPUT. SCI., (1992), vol. 31, pages 301 - 310
    - R. MURUGAN ET AL., "Predicting Physical Properties from Molecular Structure", CHEMTECH, (199406), pages 17 - 23
    - Beilstein Handbook, Lange's Handbook of Chemistry, and the CRC Handbook of Chemistry and Physics
    - J. GORDON; R. A. FORD, The Chemist's Companion, JOHN WILEY & SONS PUBLISHERS, (1972), pages 30 - 36
    - DAVID T. STANTON, "Development of a Quantitative Structure--Property Relationship Model for Estimating Normal Boiling Points of Small Multifunctional Organic Molecules", JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL INFORMATION AND COMPUTER SCIENCES, (20001101), vol. 40, pages 81 - 90
 WO2000US00839
 US19960621019
 US19960620627
 US19960620767
 US19960620513
 US19960621285
 US19960621299
 US19960621298
 US19960620626
 US19960620625
 US19960620772
 US19960621281
 US19960620514
 US19960620958