blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1767167 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1767167



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 171
23.03.2012 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.04.2011 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
04.04.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
04.04.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
04.04.2011 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
04.01.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
04.01.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
04.01.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 34
03.03.2009 Claims Search / examination 3
03.03.2009 Description Search / examination 5
03.03.2009 Description Search / examination 4
03.03.2009 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.11.2008 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.10.2008 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
09.06.2008 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
27.05.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
23.05.2008 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
22.04.2008 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
14.03.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
14.03.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 3
14.03.2008 European search report Search / examination 2
29.11.2007 Enquiry as to when the search report can be expected Search / examination 1
13.11.2007 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
11.10.2007 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 5
11.10.2007 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 2
28.02.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
19.01.2007 Modified abstract Search / examination 1
10.10.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.10.2006 Priority document Search / examination 40
22.09.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Claims Search / examination 3
22.09.2006 Description Search / examination 12
22.09.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
22.09.2006 Drawings Search / examination 19
22.09.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3