blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1767167


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.10.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2013  [2013/45]
27.09.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.10.2013  [2013/44]
14.06.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.07.2013  [2013/29]
17.05.2013 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.06.2013  [2013/25]
27.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2012  [2012/35]
13.07.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2012  [2012/33]
13.04.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.05.2012  [2012/20]
23.03.2012 No opposition filed within time limit published on  25.04.2012  [2012/17]
10.02.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.03.2012  [2012/11]
03.02.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.03.2012  [2012/10]
27.01.2012 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.02.2012  [2012/09]
02.12.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.01.2012  [2012/01]
25.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2011  [2011/52]
11.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2011  [2011/50]
04.11.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2011  [2011/49]
28.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  30.11.2011  [2011/48]
21.10.2011 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.11.2011  [2011/47]
15.04.2011 (Expected) grant published on  18.05.2011  [2011/20]
11.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
11.04.2011 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
04.01.2011 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
17.09.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.09.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
07.03.2009 New entry: Reply to examination report
21.11.2008 Definitive list of designations published on  24.12.2008  [2008/52]
13.11.2008 First examination report
11.11.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
04.11.2008 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
17.10.2008 Request for examination filed published on  19.11.2008  [2008/47]
20.09.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.06.2008 Change - representative published on  09.07.2008  [2008/28]
14.03.2008 Publication of search report published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
14.03.2008 Change - classification published on  16.04.2008  [2008/16]
09.11.2007 Change - applicant published on  12.12.2007  [2007/50]
23.02.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  28.03.2007  [2007/13]