Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1767167

EP1767167 - Post decompression marker introducer system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2012
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
1625 West 3rd Street
Tempe, AZ 85280-1740 / US
For all designated states
Bard Shannon Limited
Weverstedehof 10
3431 HR Nieuwegein / NL
[2007/50]
Former [2007/13]For all designated states
Inrad, Inc.
4375 Donker Ct., S.E.
Kentwood, MI 49512 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Field, Steven E.
3373 Brookpoint Dr., S.E.
Grand Rapids, MI 49546 / US
 [2007/13]
Representative(s)Tomlinson, Edward James , et al
Frohwitter
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
P.O. Box 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/28]Tomlinson, Edward James , et al
Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte P.O. Box 86 03 68
81630 München / DE
Former [2007/13]Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron
Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48
81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date06121084.522.09.2006
[2007/13]
Priority number, dateUS2005059646726.09.2005         Original published format: US 596467
[2007/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1767167
Date:28.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1767167
Date:16.04.2008
[2008/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1767167
Date:18.05.2011
Language:EN
[2011/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/00, A61B10/02
[2008/16]
Former International [2007/13]A61B19/00, // A61B10/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/13]
TitleGerman:System zum Einsetzen eines Markers nach Druckentlastung[2007/13]
English:Post decompression marker introducer system[2007/13]
French:Système pour l'introduction d'un marqueur après décompression[2007/13]
Examination procedure08.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/47]
04.11.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.03.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2011Fee for grant paid
04.04.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.02.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
14.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
HU18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
TR18.05.2011
BG18.08.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
IE22.09.2011
LU22.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
TR18.05.2011
BG18.08.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
IE22.09.2011
LU22.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2013/29]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
BG18.08.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
IE22.09.2011
LU22.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2013/25]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
IE22.09.2011
LU22.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/35]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
IE22.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/33]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
CH30.09.2011
LI30.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/20]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
MC30.09.2011
Former [2012/11]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
PL18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2012/10]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
DK18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
RO18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
SK18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2012/09]CY18.05.2011
CZ18.05.2011
EE18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/50]CY18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
LV18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
SI18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
IS18.09.2011
PT19.09.2011
PL26.09.2011
Former [2011/49]CY18.05.2011
FI18.05.2011
LT18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
GR19.08.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2011/48]LT18.05.2011
SE18.05.2011
PT19.09.2011
Former [2011/47]LT18.05.2011
PT19.09.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]US6234177  (BARSCH THOMAS [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 54 - column 7, line 2; figures 4C,5 *;
 [DA]US6712774  (VOEGELE JAMES W [US], et al)
by applicantUS6712774
 US6234177