EP1770385 - Document durability testing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De La Rue International Limited De La Rue House, Jays Close, Viables Basingstoke, Hampshire RG22 4BS / GB | [2007/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chamberlain, Adrian 14G Portacre Rise Basingstoke Hampshire RG21 8YG / GB | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | Skone James, Robert Edmund Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06121482.1 | 29.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | GB20050019970 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0519970 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1770385 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1770385 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | [2011/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N3/00 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G01N3/56 (EP);
G01N2203/0282 (EP);
G01N33/34 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/40] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Prüfung der Haltbarkeit von Dokumenten | [2007/14] | English: | Document durability testing apparatus | [2007/14] | French: | Appareil de test de durabilité de documents | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/42] | 12.05.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2734375 (M.GALBRAITH ET AL) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US3063285 (HUNDERUP JENSEN IB, et al) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 9 - line 20 * * column 1, line 30 - line 42 * * column 2, line 23 - column 3, line 9; figure 2; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US3675476 (ZAPFE PAUL C) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - line 10 ** column 2, line 63 - line 72; claim 1 *; | [AP]EP1607732 (THIMON [FR]) [AP] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] , [0011] - [0014] - [0016] - [0022] - [0026] , [0030] - [0032]; figures 1-4; claims 1,10,11 * |