blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1775361

EP1775361 - Modular drive system for weaving machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.10.2009
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip16.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.11.2009  [2009/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Smit S.p.A. - Unipersonale
Viale dell'Industria 135
36015 SCHIO (Vicenza) / IT
[2007/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Corain, Luciano
Viale Ferrarin 76
36100 Vicenza / IT
02 / Cateni, Ugo
Via Montanara 25
36015 Schio (Vicenza) / IT
03 / Bonollo, Fabio
Via XXIX Aprile, 64
36036 Torrebelvicino (Vicenza) / IT
04 / Garbin, Andrea
Via Rufilli 13
36043 Camisano Vicentino (Vicenza) / IT
 [2007/16]
Representative(s)Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A.
Via Piemonte 26
00187 Roma / IT
[N/P]
Former [2008/10]Iannone, Carlo Luigi, et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26
00187 Roma / IT
Former [2007/41]De Gregori, Antonella, et al
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10
20121 Milano / IT
Former [2007/16]Coppo, Alessandro, et al
Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date06122064.611.10.2006
[2007/16]
Priority number, dateIT2005VI0027817.10.2005         Original published format: IT VI20050278
[2007/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1775361
Date:18.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/16]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1775361
Date:19.11.2008
[2008/47]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.10.2008
ClassificationIPC:D03D51/00, D03D51/02
[2007/16]
CPC:
D03D51/007 (EP); D03C1/146 (EP); D03D47/27 (EP);
D03D47/275 (EP); D03D51/005 (EP)
Designated contracting states[2009/30]
Former [2007/16]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Modulares Antriebssystem für Webmaschinen[2007/16]
English:Modular drive system for weaving machines[2007/16]
French:Système d'entraînement modulaire pour métiers à tisser[2007/16]
Examination procedure20.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/47]
26.06.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2009/47]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4935863  (CALVAS ROLAND [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * columns 3-10; figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO9325740  (AELMHULTS BRUK AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 5 - page 13, line 3; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2003140980  (OSTYN GEERT [BE]) [A] 1-15* figure 1 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.