blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1777623

EP1777623 - Method and device for monitoring the validity of protected commands in a data procesing unit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.03.2010
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip26.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 28.04.2010  [2010/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2007/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Mueller, Bernd
Stahler Str. 38
70839, Gerlingen / DE
02 / Angerbauer, Ralf
Clara-Schumann-Str. 4
71701, Schwieberdingen / DE
03 / Boehl, Eberhard
Heimbuehlstr. 36
72768, Reutlingen / DE
04 / Kottke, Thomas
Leimentalstrasse 13/1
71139, Ehningen / DE
 [2007/17]
Application number, filing date06122399.617.10.2006
[2007/17]
Priority number, dateDE2005105076924.10.2005         Original published format: DE102005050769
[2007/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1777623
Date:25.04.2007
Language:DE
[2007/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1777623
Date:29.04.2009
[2009/18]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2009
ClassificationIPC:G06F11/10
[2007/17]
CPC:
G06F11/1012 (EP)
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2010/01]
Former [2007/17]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überwachen der Gültigkeit von geschützten Befehlsworten in einer Datenverarbeitungseinheit[2007/17]
English:Method and device for monitoring the validity of protected commands in a data procesing unit[2007/17]
French:Procédé et dispositif destinés au contrôle de le validité de mots d'instruction protégés dans une unité de traitement de données[2007/17]
Examination procedure30.10.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/17]
08.12.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200904   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US5987585  (MOTOYAMA NOBUAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 7, line 37 - line 46 * * column 8, line 36 - line 49 * * column 9, line 14 - line 18 * * column 9, line 51 - line 56 * * column 15, line 10 - line 30 * * claims 1-3 * * figures 3,4,10 *;
 [X]US6718494  (JAMIL SUJAT [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 11 - line 21 * * column 4, line 63 - column 6, line 16 * * column 7, line 61 - column 8, line 30 * * figures 1,3,5a,5b,7 *;
 [X]US2005071723  (LUICK DAVID ARNOLD [US]) [X] 1,8 * page 4, paragraph 32; figure 6 *;
 [A]US6543028  (JAMIL SUJAT [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.