blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1777696 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1777696



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 174
11.03.2013 Closing of application Search / examination 1
05.12.2012 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
27.11.2012 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
21.08.2012 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 1
14.08.2012 Request for change of address - applicant Search / examination 2
03.07.2012 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
27.06.2012 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
11.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.05.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant Search / examination 1
17.10.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.10.2011 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
27.10.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
20.05.2010 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
20.05.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
20.05.2010 Description Search / examination 2
20.05.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
26.01.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 6
26.01.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 4
07.01.2010 Claims Search / examination 5
07.01.2010 Description Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.01.2010 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
05.01.2010 Final instructions (loss of partial rights) Search / examination 1
21.10.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
21.10.2009 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
25.09.2009 Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) Search / examination 2
09.09.2009 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.08.2009 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
20.02.2009 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
20.01.2009 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.01.2009 European search opinion Search / examination 9
20.01.2009 European search report Search / examination 4
20.11.2008 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.11.2008 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.11.2008 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
30.10.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
30.10.2008 Partial European search report Search / examination 4
28.03.2007 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
23.10.2006 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
23.10.2006 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.10.2006 Priority document Search / examination 29
17.10.2006 Abstract Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Claims Search / examination 4
17.10.2006 Description Search / examination 19
17.10.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
17.10.2006 Drawings Search / examination 8
17.10.2006 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 3