blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1777696


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.03.2013 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  17.04.2013  [2013/16]
30.11.2012 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
26.11.2012 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
17.08.2012 Change - applicant published on  19.09.2012  [2012/38]
29.06.2012 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
11.06.2012 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
26.10.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
22.05.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
22.01.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.01.2010 New entry: Reply to examination report
06.01.2010 New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect
27.10.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.09.2009 New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit
11.09.2009 First examination report
05.09.2009 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.01.2009 Publication of search report published on  18.02.2009  [2009/08]
18.09.2008 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.03.2007 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]
23.03.2007 Request for examination filed published on  25.04.2007  [2007/17]