blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1777696
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2007091019Global Dossier 26.04.2007A1
Priority number Date
KR20050099313 20.10.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20070043258Global Dossier 25.04.2007A
Priority number Date
KR20050099313 20.10.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP1777696Global Dossier 18.02.2009A3
EP1777696 25.04.2007A2
Priority number Date
KR20050099313 20.10.2005
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN101030362B 29.06.2011B
CN101030362 05.09.2007A
Priority number Date
KR20050099313 20.10.2005