blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP1777696

Designated contracting statesAT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
NL 
PL 
PT 
RO 
SE 
SI 
SK 
TR 
Examination procedure27.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
17.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201207   M06   Not yet paid
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:25.04.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20061017
 
Event date:25.04.2007 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A2
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:25.04.2007 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK YU
 
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A3
Designated State(s):AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
 
Event date:18.02.2009 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:
Countries concerned:AL BA HR MK RS
 
Event date:14.10.2009 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20090909
 
Event date:19.09.2012 
Event description:RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED
Owner Name:SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
 
Event date:19.09.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R108
Code Expl.:-DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE
 
Event date:08.11.2012 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R108
Code Expl.:-DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE
Effective DATE:20120919
 
Event date:17.04.2013 
Event description:APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN
Effective DATE:20120822