Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1777696

EP1777696 - Display apparatus and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2013
Database last updated on 17.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.04.2013  [2013/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/38]
Former [2007/17]For all designated states
SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD.
416, Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Na, Hong-ju
Mokryeon Apt. 202-204 1052, Hogye-dong Dongan-gu
Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Park, Kil-soo Ssangyong Apt. 107-1301
691, Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Jang, Sung-hwan
Hanjin Apt. 704-1302 Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2007/17]
Representative(s)Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/17]Robinson, Ian Michael
Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road
Halifax, West Yorkshire HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date06122457.217.10.2006
[2007/17]
Priority number, dateKR2005009931320.10.2005         Original published format: KR 20050099313
[2007/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1777696
Date:25.04.2007
Language:EN
[2007/17]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1777696
Date:18.02.2009
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G09G5/10
[2007/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür[2007/17]
English:Display apparatus and control method thereof[2007/17]
French:Appareil d'affichage et son procédé de commande[2007/17]
Examination procedure17.10.2006Examination requested  [2007/17]
19.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
07.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/16]
27.11.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/16]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.09.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
17.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201207   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]JPH08317250  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD) [X] 1,2,6,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5,12,13;
 [Y]WO2004105402  (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [Y] 3-5,12,13 * page 1, line 5 - line 13; figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 21 - page 3, line 22 * * page 4, line 14 - line 28 *;
 [Y]US5757343  (NAGAKUBO TETSURO [JP]) [Y] 7-9 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 8, line 40 - column 10, line 19; figures 2,3,7,10,11 *;
 [Y]EP1316938  (PIONEER CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9 * abstract *