Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1757619

EP1757619 - Osteoprotegerin in milk [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.2010
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
P.O. Box 353
1800 Vevey / CH
[2007/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Vidal, Karine
Chemin de Bérée 56
1010 Lausanne / CH
02 / van den Broek, Peter
Groenlinglaan 90
3951 WJ Maarn / NL
03 / Offord-Cavin, Elizabeth
Chemin du Rategniau, Haut de Perche B
1041 Poliez-Pittet / CH
04 / Donnet-Hughes, Anne
Route de Châtel-St-Denis 29B
1806 Saint Léger / CH
 [2007/09]
Representative(s)Marquardt, Ulf
Nestec S.A.
CT-IAM
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/31]Marquardt, Ulf
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2007/09]Dixon, Sarah
Avenue Nestlé, 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date06124157.615.03.2002
[2007/09]
Priority number, dateEP2001010841403.04.2001         Original published format: EP 01108414
[2007/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1757619
Date:28.02.2007
Language:EN
[2007/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1757619
Date:14.03.2007
[2007/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1757619
Date:17.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/705, C12N15/12, A61K38/17, A23L1/305, A23C9/13, A23C19/093, A23K1/16
[2007/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2007/09]
TitleGerman:Osteoprotegerin in Milch[2007/09]
English:Osteoprotegerin in milk[2007/09]
French:Ostéoprotégerine dans le lait[2007/09]
Examination procedure14.09.2007Examination requested  [2007/44]
26.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
25.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.07.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2009Fee for grant paid
19.11.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP02722228.0  / EP1377610
Opposition(s)18.11.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2011/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 04
15.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 05
14.03.2007Renewal fee patent year 06
14.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 07
13.03.2009Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
TR17.02.2010
LU15.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
GR18.05.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/43]AT17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
LU15.03.2010
MC31.03.2010
GR18.05.2010
Former [2011/09]AT17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
DK17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
MC31.03.2010
GR18.05.2010
Former [2011/03]AT17.02.2010
CY17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
SE17.02.2010
MC31.03.2010
GR18.05.2010
Former [2010/41]AT17.02.2010
FI17.02.2010
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0816380  (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-14 * page 5, line 1 - line 13; examples 4,25,26; sequence 4 *;
 [X]EP0786473  (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 3-14 * page 2, line 11 - line 35; examples 7,8,10,12; claims 1,8 *;
 [X]WO0116299  (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 3, line 11 - line 33 *;
 [XD]WO0024771  (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al) [XD] 1-14 * page 33, line 21 - page 36, line 5; claims 35-40,43-46 *;
 [PX]WO0178533  (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [PX] 1-14 * page 5; claims 1,3,8,12,17 *;
 [X]  KONG YY ET AL., "Osteoprotegerin ligand: a regulator of immune responses and bone physiology", IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (200010), vol. 21, no. 10, pages 495 - 502, XP004217459 [X] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0167-5699(00)01718-7
 [X]  SIMONET WS ET AL., "Osteoprotegerin: A Novel Secreted Protein Involved in the Regulation of Bone Density", CELL, (19970418), vol. 89, pages 309 - 319, XP002077048 [X] 1-14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(00)80209-3
 [L]  Roempp Online, STUTTGART, GEORG THIEME VERLAG, XP002415951 [L] * Stichwort " Milch" *
 [L]  BELITZ-GROSCH, Food Chemistry, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, NEW YORK, SPRINGER-VERLAG, ISBN 3-540-64692-2, XP002415949 [L] * Chapter 10.1 "Milk", page 470 *
 [T]  VIDAL K ET AL., "Osteoprotegerin in Human Milk: A Potential Role in the Regulation of Bone Metabolism and Immune Development", PEDIATRIC RESEARCH, (20040407), vol. 55, no. 6, pages 1 - 8, XP002415948

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1203/01.pdr.0000127014.22068.15
by applicantWO0024771