Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1925924

EP1925924 - Low cost heat cost allocator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2010
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, TR
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
QUNDIS GmbH
Sonderhäuser Landstrasse 27
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/15]For all designated states
QUNDIS GmbH
Sonderhauser Landstrasse 27
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
Former [2008/22]For all designated states
Siemens Building Technologies electronic GmbH
Sonderhäuser Landstrasse 27
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Dobeneck, Wolfgang
Neue Str. 5
99996 Urbach / DE
02 / Bendlin, Georg
Frohnestrasse 9
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
03 / Leipold, Jörg
Im Haken 107a
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
04 / Menge, Andreas
Lutherstrasse 12
99974 Mühlhausen / DE
 [2008/22]
Representative(s)Weise, Wolfgang , et al
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/14]Weise, Wolfgang , et al
Siemens AG IPD SBT ZUG - Intellectual Property Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2008/22]Maier, Daniel Oliver , et al
Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Application number, filing date06124505.621.11.2006
[2008/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1925924
Date:28.05.2008
Language:DE
[2008/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1925924
Date:22.07.2009
Language:DE
[2009/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2007
ClassificationInternational:G01K17/06
[2008/22]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/22]
TitleGerman:Low-cost-Heizkostenverteiler[2008/22]
English:Low cost heat cost allocator[2008/22]
French:Répartiteur de frais de chauffage à bas coût[2008/22]
Examination procedure13.11.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2008Examination requested  [2008/52]
16.02.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.06.2009Fee for grant paid
08.06.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)23.04.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY22.07.2009
EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
TR22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
AT21.11.2009
LU21.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
HU23.01.2010
[2011/44]
Former [2011/33]EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
AT21.11.2009
LU21.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
HU23.01.2010
Former [2011/22]EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
AT21.11.2009
LU21.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/09]EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
AT21.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2011/03]EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
GR23.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
BE30.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/30]EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
MC30.11.2009
Former [2010/20]EE22.07.2009
FI22.07.2009
IE22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/17]FI22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
BG22.10.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/16]FI22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
PT22.11.2009
Former [2010/13]FI22.07.2009
LT22.07.2009
LV22.07.2009
NL22.07.2009
SE22.07.2009
SI22.07.2009
ES02.11.2009
IS22.11.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1605238  (DIEHL AKO STIFTUNG GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE8219285U  (KIENINGER & OBERGFELL FABRIK FUER TECHNISCHE LAUFWERKE UND APPARATE, 7) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE10147207  (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE20319708U  (KUNDO SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figure 3 *;
 [A]DE29515173U  (RAAB KARCHER ENERGIESERVICE GM [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figures 1,3 *