Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1795410

EP1795410 - Device for actuating a parking brake [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.12.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.10.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 09.11.2011  [2011/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265 / US
[N/P]
Former [2007/24]For all designated states
Deere & Company
One John Deere Place
Moline, IL 61265-8098 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Tarasinski Dr., Nicolai
Gotthilf-Salzmann-Str. 60
67227, Frankenthal / DE
02 / Gugel, Rainer
Feldbergstr. 27
68163, Mannheim / DE
 [2007/24]
Representative(s)Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
John Deere GmbH & Co. KG
Global Intellectual Property Services
John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/12]Magin, Ludwig Bernhard , et al
Deere & Company European Office Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70
68163 Mannheim / DE
Former [2007/24]Bradl, Joachim
Deere & Company European Office Patent Department Steubenstrasse 36-42
68163 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date06124992.629.11.2006
[2007/24]
Priority number, dateDE2005105779403.12.2005         Original published format: DE102005057794
[2007/24]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1795410
Date:13.06.2007
Language:DE
[2007/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1795410
Date:04.02.2009
Language:DE
[2009/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.2007
ClassificationInternational:B60T1/00
[2007/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2007/24]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Betätigung einer Parkbremse[2007/24]
English:Device for actuating a parking brake[2007/24]
French:dispositif pour l'actuation d'un frein de stationnement[2007/24]
Examination procedure13.12.2007Examination requested  [2008/04]
21.01.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.05.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.07.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.11.2008Fee for grant paid
19.11.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.11.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.02.2009
CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
[2011/45]
Former [2011/33]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
HU05.08.2009
Former [2011/03]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
GR05.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/13]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
BG04.05.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Former [2010/02]CZ04.02.2009
DK04.02.2009
EE04.02.2009
IE04.02.2009
LT04.02.2009
LV04.02.2009
NL04.02.2009
PL04.02.2009
RO04.02.2009
SI04.02.2009
SK04.02.2009
SE04.05.2009
ES15.05.2009
IS04.06.2009
PT06.07.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005258683  (YAMAGUCHI TOHMA [JP]) [A] 1,10,11,18 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1199233  (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1,10,18,19 * abstract *;
 [A]DE10037565  (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]) [A] 1,19 * column 3, paragraph 14 - column 4, line 40; figure 1 *
by applicantUS2005258683