Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1759732

EP1759732 - Apparatus for detecting and treating ventricular arrhythmia [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.05.2012
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.12.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR
published on 23.01.2013  [2013/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Medtronic, Inc.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, MN 55432-5604 / US
For all designated states
Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc.
4100 Hamline Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55112-5707 / US
[2011/29]
Former [2011/26]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US
For all designated states
Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc.
4100 Hamline Avenue
St. Paul, MN 55112-5707 / US
Former [2007/10]For all designated states
MEDTRONIC, INC.
710 Medtronic Parkway
Minneapolis, Minnesota 55432-5604 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Heinrich, Stephen D.
4147 Coffman Lane
Minneapolis, MN 55406 / US
02 / Brown, Ward
N1484 Hagen Road
LaCrosse, WI 54601 / US
 [2007/10]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2007/10]Hilleringmann, Jochen
Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus am Dom)
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date06126700.121.11.2001
[2007/10]
Priority number, dateUS20000252811P22.11.2000         Original published format: US 252811 P
[2007/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1759732
Date:07.03.2007
Language:EN
[2007/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1759732
Date:20.07.2011
Language:EN
[2011/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.02.2007
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/39, A61N1/362
[2007/10]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   LI,   NL,   SE [2007/10]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Erkennung und Behandlung von ventrikulären Arrhythmien[2007/12]
English:Apparatus for detecting and treating ventricular arrhythmia[2007/10]
French:Appareil de détection et de traitement de l'arythmie ventriculaire[2007/12]
Former [2007/10]Vorrichtung zur Erkennung und Behandlung von ventrikulärer Arrhythmie
Former [2007/10]Appareil de détection et de traitement d'arythmie ventriculaire
Examination procedure09.08.2007Examination requested  [2007/39]
01.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.03.2011Fee for grant paid
25.03.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP01987042.7  / EP1335776
EP05105683.6  / EP1584351
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010987042) is  15.10.2004
Opposition(s)23.04.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 06
06.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 08
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 09
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
CH30.11.2011
FR30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
[2013/04]
Former [2012/33]NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
CH30.11.2011
LI30.11.2011
Former [2012/10]NL20.07.2011
SE20.07.2011
Former [2012/08]NL20.07.2011
Documents cited:Search[XY]US5603732  (DAHL ROGER W ET AL) [X] 1,5,12,13 * column 9, line 33 - line 52; figure 22 * * column 7, line 56 - line 67; figure 14 * [Y] 3,4,6,7;
 [DY]US5331966  (BENNETT TOM D ET AL) [DY] 4 * column 13, line 12 - column 14, line 44 *;
 [Y]US5601607  (ADAMS THEODORE P) [Y] 6 * column 4, line 41 - line 47 *;
 [Y]US5243978  (DUFFIN JR EDWIN G) [Y] 3 * column 3, line 22 - line 51 *;
 [E]WO0222208  (CAPPATO RICCARDO ;BARDY GUST H (US); CAMERON HEALTH INC (US)) [E] 1-7,12,13 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 2 * * page 11, line 7 - page 12, line 17 *;
 [Y]US5713926  (HAUSER ET AL) [Y] 7 * column 6, line 51 - line 67; figure 11 *;
 [X]US5376105  (HEDBERG SVEN-ERIK) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 26 - line 30 *;
 [E]WO0224275  (CAPPATO RICCARDO ;BARDY GUST H (US); CAMERON HEALTH INC (US)) [E] 1-7,12 * page 8, line 1 - line 23 * * page 12, line 1 - line 16 *
ExaminationUS5439485
by applicantUS5158078
 US4958632
 US5318593
 USRE27652E
 US5314430
 US4392407
 US5261400
 US5292338