Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1940097

EP1940097 - Messaging method and server [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.03.2011
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.03.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.04.2011  [2011/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson AB
Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2010/19]
Former [2008/52]For all designated states
Ericsson AB
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Former [2008/40]For all designated states
Ericsson AB
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Former [2008/27]For all designated states
Mobeon AB
Box 7120
103 87 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Beije, Magnus
Jordgränd 30
192 74, SOLLENTUNA / SE
 [2008/27]
Representative(s)Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/27]Röthinger, Rainer
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date06127305.828.12.2006
[2008/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1940097
Date:02.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1940097
Date:28.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.03.2007
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/58
[2008/27]
Designated contracting statesGB [2009/11]
Former [2008/27]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Server zur Benachrichtigung[2008/27]
English:Messaging method and server[2008/27]
French:Procédé et serveur de messagerie[2008/27]
Examination procedure08.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/04]
03.01.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
29.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.02.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
27.04.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.10.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.02.2010Fee for grant paid
26.02.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.01.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[DA]US2004019487  (KLEINDIENST JAN [CZ] ET AL) [DA] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0078] * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION GROUP CORE NETWORK AND TERMINALS, 3GPP TS 23.140 V6.14.0, "Multimedia Messaging Service (MMS); Functional description; Stage 2 (Release 6)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT, (200609), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/archive/23_series/23.140/23140-6e0.zip, (20070312), XP002424217 [A] 1-16 * section 8.1.3 - 8.1.5 *