EP1939699 - Multifunctional coaxial corrector device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MONTRES BREGUET S.A. 1344 L'Abbaye / CH | [2008/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Laucella, Vincent Route de France 38 1348, Le Brassus / CH | 02 /
Goeller, Eric 26b, rue des Agettes 25370, Les Hôpitaux Vieux / FR | [2012/22] |
Former [2008/27] | 01 /
Laucella, Vincent Route de France 38 1348, Le Brassus / CH | ||
02 /
Goeller, Eric 26b, rue des Agettes 25370, Les Hôpitaux Vieux / FR | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2010/12] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2009/35] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Fbg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | ||
Former [2008/52] | Rossand, Isabelle, et al ICB Ingenieurs Conseils en Brevets Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | ||
Former [2008/27] | Thérond, Gérard Raymond, et al I C B Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 06127370.2 | 29.12.2006 | [2008/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1939699 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1939699 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G04B3/04, G04B27/00 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G04B27/004 (EP,US);
G04B1/02 (KR);
G04B1/00 (KR);
G04B3/048 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | Multifunktionsvorrichtung zur koaxialen Korrektur | [2008/27] | English: | Multifunctional coaxial corrector device | [2008/27] | French: | Dispositif correcteur coaxial multifonction | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 05.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 06.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2006 | AT | 30.05.2012 | CY | 30.05.2012 | CZ | 30.05.2012 | DK | 30.05.2012 | EE | 30.05.2012 | FI | 30.05.2012 | IT | 30.05.2012 | LT | 30.05.2012 | LV | 30.05.2012 | NL | 30.05.2012 | PL | 30.05.2012 | RO | 30.05.2012 | SE | 30.05.2012 | SI | 30.05.2012 | SK | 30.05.2012 | TR | 30.05.2012 | BG | 30.08.2012 | GR | 31.08.2012 | ES | 10.09.2012 | IS | 30.09.2012 | PT | 01.10.2012 | IE | 29.12.2012 | LU | 29.12.2012 | BE | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
LU | 29.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
TR | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
BE | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
BG | 30.08.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
ES | 10.09.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
PT | 01.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
IT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
PL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
RO | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
SK | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
EE | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
DK | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
NL | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 30.05.2012 | |
CY | 30.05.2012 | ||
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
SI | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
LV | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
GR | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 30.05.2012 | |
FI | 30.05.2012 | ||
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
IS | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 30.05.2012 | |
LT | 30.05.2012 | ||
SE | 30.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 30.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5299177 (KOCH DANIEL [CH]) [DA] 1-12 * column 2, line 57 - column 8, line 63 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]EP1336907 (RICHEMONT INT SA [CH]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0039] - [0041] * * figures 1-3b *; | [A]US3837162 (MEITINGER H) [A] 1-12 * figure 4 * * column 2, lines 35-39 * |